EP3305393 - METHOD FOR REDUCING HYDROGEN CHLORIDE CONCENTRATION IN GAS STREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/15] | METHODS AND ACTIVE MATERIALS FOR REDUCING HALIDE CONCENTRATION IN GAS STREAMS | ||
[2020/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Corporation 1600 West Hill Street Louisville, Kentucky 40210 / US | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Justin X. 3904 Anderson Woods Place Louisville, KY 40245 / US | 02 /
SOKHEY, Simran K. 1201 South Brook Street Apt 203 Louisville, KY 40203 / US | 03 /
SPENCER, Jason E. 1665 Marvy Lane NE Palmyra, IN 47164 / US | 04 /
CAI, Yeping 12910 Willow Forest Drive Louisville, KY 40245 / US | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Dannenberger, Oliver Andre, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastrasse 17 81925 München / DE | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 17202974.6 | 19.05.2014 | [2018/15] | Priority number, date | US201313917029 | 13.06.2013 Original published format: US201313917029 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3305393 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3305393 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3305393 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/68 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
B01J20/08 (EP,US);
B01J20/02 (EP,RU,US);
B01D53/04 (US);
B01D53/68 (RU);
B01D53/685 (EP,US);
B01J20/041 (EP,US);
B01J20/06 (EP,US);
B01J20/103 (EP,US);
B01J20/12 (EP,US);
B01J20/18 (EP,US);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/28016 (EP,US);
B01J20/28019 (EP,US);
B01J20/28057 (EP,US);
B01J20/28069 (EP,US);
B01J20/3007 (EP,US);
B01J20/3204 (EP,US);
B01J20/3236 (EP,US);
B22F1/00 (EP,RU,US);
B22F1/10 (EP,RU,US);
B01D2251/30 (EP,US);
B01D2251/306 (EP,US);
B01D2251/40 (EP,US);
B01D2251/408 (EP,US);
B01D2251/60 (EP,US);
B01D2251/602 (EP,US);
B01D2253/112 (EP,US);
B01D2253/1122 (EP,US);
B01D2253/1124 (EP,US);
B01D2257/204 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER CHLORWASSERSTOFFKONZENTRATION IN GASSTRÖMEN | [2020/02] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING HYDROGEN CHLORIDE CONCENTRATION IN GAS STREAMS | [2020/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉDUIRE LA CONCENTRATION EN CHLORURE D'HYDROGÈNE DANS DES FLUX DE GAZ | [2020/02] |
Former [2018/15] | VERFAHREN UND WIRKSTOFFE ZUR REDUZIERUNG EINER HALOGENIDKONZENTRATION IN GASSTRÖMEN | ||
Former [2018/15] | METHODS AND ACTIVE MATERIALS FOR REDUCING HALIDE CONCENTRATION IN GAS STREAMS | ||
Former [2018/15] | PROCÉDÉS ET MATÉRIAUX ACTIFS POUR RÉDUIRE LA CONCENTRATION D'HALOGÉNURES DANS DES FLUX DE GAZ | Examination procedure | 22.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 22.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 22.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14730388.7 / EP3007806 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2014 | AL | 15.07.2020 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | DK | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | ES | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | IT | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | PL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SE | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | NO | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.05.2014 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MK | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 19.05.2014 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4045538 (SARE EDWARD J, et al); | [XAI]US4173549 (FEIN MARVIN M [US], et al); | [XAI]EP0371331 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [I]EP0792681 (JAPAN PIONICS [JP]); | [XAI]WO9845280 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US], et al); | [I]WO9953118 (ADVANCED TECH MATERIALS [US]); | [I]EP1063001 (JAPAN PIONICS [JP]); | [XI]WO2008040966 (M I DRILLING FLUIDS UK LTD [GB], et al); | [XI]US2008207953 (HOUSSIN CHRISTOPHE [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2008144402 (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) |