EP3300752 - CONTACT TRIGGER RELEASE NEEDLE GUARD WITH ELASTIC SPRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safety Syringes, Inc. 2875 Loker Avenue East Carlsbad, California 92010 / US | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHOONMAKER, Ryan 1211 Elfin Forest Road San Marcos, CA 92078 / US | [2018/14] | Representative(s) | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2018/14] | Application number, filing date | 17203217.9 | 19.06.2013 | [2018/14] | Priority number, date | US201261662303P | 20.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261662303 P | US201313802130 | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US201313802130 | [2018/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3300752 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3300752 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/50, A61M5/32, // A61M5/46 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
A61M5/3202 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/3204 (CN,US);
A61M5/3243 (US);
A61M5/326 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/3271 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2005/3247 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3258 (CN,US);
A61M2005/3267 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/19 (US);
A61M2205/581 (CN,US);
A61M2205/586 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/3272 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/46 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] |
Former [2018/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NADELSCHUTZ MIT KONTAKTAUSLÖSER UND SPRUNGFEDER | [2018/14] | English: | CONTACT TRIGGER RELEASE NEEDLE GUARD WITH ELASTIC SPRING | [2018/14] | French: | PROTECTION D'AIGUILLE À DÉCLENCHEMENT DE LIBÉRATION PAR CONTACT AVEC RESSORT ÉLASTIQUE | [2018/14] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 14.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13735119.3 / EP2863969 | EP15190699.7 / EP3006070 | Divisional application(s) | EP18212332.3 / EP3473286 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2013 | AL | 27.02.2019 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | DK | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | NL | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | RS | 27.02.2019 | SE | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | IE | 19.06.2019 | LU | 19.06.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.06.2013 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IE | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 19.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.06.2013 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IE | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 19.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IE | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 19.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IE | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 19.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IE | 19.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005277894 (WESTBYE LARS T [US], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0032] - [0035]; figures 3A-3B *; | [A]US2009259196 (GRATWOHL CHRISTIAN [CH], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 6, column r, line 39 - page 7, column l, line 3 * * page 7, column l, line 22 - line 28 * * figures 1, 3-7 * |