EP3489222 - SULFASALAZINE SALTS, PRODUCTION PROCESSES AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states medac Gesellschaft für klinische Spezialpräparate mbH Theaterstrasse 6 22880 Wedel / DE | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENSONIDES-HARSEMA, Marguérite M. 1819 Latexo Drive Houston, TX 77018 / US | 02 /
BIALLECK, Sebastian medac GmbH Theaterstr. 6 22880 Wedel / DE | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Leipziger Platz 15 10117 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Feldmann, Ute Patentanwaltskanzlei Feldmann Leipziger Platz 15 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 17203275.7 | 23.11.2017 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489222 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/76, A61K31/4402, A61P29/00 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
C07D213/76 (EP,US);
A61K31/4402 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K9/0031 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
C07B2200/13 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SULFASALAZINESALZE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGEN | [2019/22] | English: | SULFASALAZINE SALTS, PRODUCTION PROCESSES AND USES | [2019/22] | French: | SELS DE SULFASALAZINE, PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET UTILISATIONS | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 25.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB1166684 (PHARMACIA AB [SE]) [X] 9 * example 1 * [A] 10-15 [I] 1-3,6,7; | [XAI]CN106279008 (ZHEJIANG JIUZHOU PHARM CO LTD) [X] 9 * example 9 * [A] 10-15 [I] 1,2,4,7,8; | [XA] - LINDBERG ED - CLARY DAVID, "ESCA applied to liquids. ESCA spectra from molecular ions in solution", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 39, no. 1, (19760401), pages 8 - 10, URL: http://api.elsevier.com/content/article/PII:0009261476851834?httpAccept=text/plain, XP009503440 [X] 9 * figure 1 * [A] 10-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-2614(76)85183-4 | by applicant | GB564990 | US2396145 | GB1166684 | WO9722596 | WO9730035 | WO9732856 | WO9813354 | WO9902166 | WO0001389 | WO0040529 | WO0041669 | WO0144239 | WO0192224 | WO0204434 | WO0208213 | - MATASIC R; DIETZ AB; VUK-PAVLOVIC S., "Maturation of human dendritic cells as sulfasalazine target", Croat Med J, (20010800), vol. 42, no. 4, pages 440 - 5, XP009027785 | - P GADANGI; M LONGAKER; D NAIME; R I LEVIN; P A RECHT; M C MONTESINOS; M T BUCKLEY; G CARLIN; B N CRONSTEIN, "The anti-inflammatory mechanism of sulfasalazine is related to adenosine release at inflamed sites", J Immunol, (19960301), vol. 156, no. 5, pages 1937 - 1941 | - COUTO D1; RIBEIRO D; FREITAS M; GOMES A; LIMA JL; FERNANDES E., "Scavenging of reactive oxygen and nitrogen species by the prodrug sulfasalazine and its metabolites 5-aminosalicylic acid and sulfapyridine", Redox Rep., (20100000), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 259 - 67 | - NYGARD, B.; OLOFSSON, J.; SANDBERG, M., "Some physicochemical properties of salicylazosulphapyridine, including its solubility, protolytic constants and general spectrochemical and Polarographic behavior", Acta Pharmaceutica Suecica, (19660000), vol. 3, pages 313 - 342 | - GG MOHAMED et al., "Structural and Thermal Characterization of Cerium, Thorium and Uranyl Complexes of Sulfasalazine", Spectrochim Acta A Mol Biomol Spectrosc, (20050613), vol. 62, no. 4-5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.saa.2005.04.006, pages 1095 - 1101, XP005174792 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.saa.2005.04.006 | - ARIK DAHAN; GORDON L. AMIDON, "Small intestinal efflux mediated by MRP2 and BCRP shifts sulfasalazine intestinal permeability from high to low, enabling its colonic targeting", American Journal of Physiology - Gastrointestinal and Liver Physiology, (20090721), vol. 297, no. 2, pages G371 - G377 | - LIANG E1; CHESSIC K; YAZDANIAN M., "Evaluation of an accelerated Caco-2 cell permeability model.", J Pharm Sci., (20000300), vol. 89, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200003)89:3<336::AID-JPS5>3.0.CO;2-M, pages 336 - 45, XP002376235 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6017(200003)89:3<336::AID-JPS5>3.0.CO;2-M | - "United States Pharmacopeia Convention. X-Ray Diffraction, General Test <941 >", United States Pharmacopeial Convention, United States Pharmacopeia, (20020000), pages 2088 - 2089 | - "United States Pharmacopeia Convention. X-Ray Diffraction, General Test <941 >", United States Pharmacopeial Convention, United States Pharmacopeia, vol. 2002, pages 2088 - 2089 | - ZAMEK-GLISZCZYNSKI MJ et al., "Characterization of SAGE Mdr1 a (P-gp), Bcrp, and Mrp2 knockout rats using loperamide, paclitaxel, sulfasalazine, and carbox-ydichloroflurorescein pharmacokinetics", Drug Metab Dispos, (20120000), vol. 40, page 1825 |