|
29.11.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.12.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.09.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
20.09.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
26.11.2021 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.06.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.11.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2018 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |