EP3489164 - A CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER COMPRISING THREE POSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGERTON, Mark Lewis The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | 02 /
ANDRES, Brian David The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 03 /
SENA, Douglas David The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2023/04] |
Former [2019/22] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 17203313.6 | 23.11.2017 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489164 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3489164 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/04 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
B65D41/0478 (EP,US);
B65D83/205 (US);
B65D83/22 (US);
B65D83/68 (US);
B65D83/753 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSS FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER MIT DREI POSITIONEN | [2019/22] | English: | A CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER COMPRISING THREE POSITIONS | [2019/22] | French: | FERMETURE POUR UN RÉCIPIENT COMPRENANT TROIS POSITIONS | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 25.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.2023 | CZ | 25.01.2023 | DK | 25.01.2023 | EE | 25.01.2023 | ES | 25.01.2023 | FI | 25.01.2023 | HR | 25.01.2023 | IT | 25.01.2023 | LT | 25.01.2023 | LV | 25.01.2023 | MC | 25.01.2023 | NL | 25.01.2023 | PL | 25.01.2023 | RO | 25.01.2023 | RS | 25.01.2023 | SE | 25.01.2023 | SI | 25.01.2023 | SK | 25.01.2023 | SM | 25.01.2023 | NO | 25.04.2023 | GR | 26.04.2023 | IS | 25.05.2023 | PT | 25.05.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
IT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 25.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4609114 (ROY GERALD L [US]) [A] 1,13 * abstract *; | [A]FR2702739 (FINANC PACKAGING DEV [FR]) [A] 1,13* abstract *; | [XA]US2005279746 (HSU CHUN-FENG [TW]) [X] 14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] * [A] 1-13 | by applicant | US5217130 | GB2339771 |