EP3490349 - BUSBAR POWER SUPPLY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wöhner GmbH & Co. KG Elektrotechnische Systeme Mönchrödener Strasse 10 96472 Rödental / DE | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINBERGER, Philipp Bergstr. 13 96450 Coburg / DE | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/35] |
Former [2019/22] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17203342.5 | 23.11.2017 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3490349 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3490349 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14, // H02B1/14, H02B1/21 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
H05K7/14324 (EP);
H02M7/003 (US);
H02J5/00 (US);
H05K7/1432 (US);
H05K7/1482 (EP,US);
H02B1/14 (EP,US);
H02B1/21 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | H05K7/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SAMMELSCHIENENSTROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/22] | English: | BUSBAR POWER SUPPLY APPARATUS | [2019/22] | French: | APPAREIL D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE DE BARRE OMNIBUS | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 25.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2017 | AL | 31.08.2022 | AT | 31.08.2022 | CY | 31.08.2022 | CZ | 31.08.2022 | DK | 31.08.2022 | EE | 31.08.2022 | FI | 31.08.2022 | HR | 31.08.2022 | LT | 31.08.2022 | LV | 31.08.2022 | MC | 31.08.2022 | MK | 31.08.2022 | RO | 31.08.2022 | RS | 31.08.2022 | SK | 31.08.2022 | SM | 31.08.2022 | IE | 23.11.2022 | LU | 23.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | FR | 30.11.2022 | GB | 30.11.2022 | NO | 30.11.2022 | GR | 01.12.2022 | IS | 31.12.2022 | PT | 02.01.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 23.11.2017 | |
AL | 31.08.2022 | ||
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CY | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
IE | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
GB | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 23.11.2017 | |
AL | 31.08.2022 | ||
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
IE | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
GB | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
IE | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
GB | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
IE | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
GB | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
IE | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
GB | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
GB | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2013094797 (KOREA BASIC SCIENCE INST [KR], et al); | [XA]EP2793540 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]); | [A]FR3027483 (VACON OYJ [FI]); | [Y]EP3076504 (WOEHNER GMBH & CO KG ELEKTROTECHNISCHE SYSTEME [DE]); | [Y]EP3246996 (WOEHNER GMBH & CO KG ELEKTROTECHNISCHE SYSTEME [DE]) | Examination | EP3076504 | EP2793540 |