EP3308785 - USE OF FLECAINIDE AS AN ANTI-CONNEXIN AGENT AND METHOD FOR POTENTIATING THE EFFECTS OF A PSYCHOTROPIC DRUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOUTHON, Franck 103 Avenue André Morizet 92100 BOULOGNE BILLANCOURT / FR | 02 /
CHARVERIAT, Mathieu 41 rue Foucher Lepelletier 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2018/16] | Application number, filing date | 17203646.9 | 24.07.2014 | [2018/16] | Priority number, date | EP20130306074 | 24.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13306074 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3308785 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3308785 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/435, A61P25/00, A61P25/06, A61P25/08, A61P25/26, A61P25/28, A61P35/00, A61K31/165 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/4458 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/192 (IL,KR);
A61K31/4188 (IL,KR);
A61K31/435 (IL,KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P1/12 (EP,IL);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL);
A61P11/00 (EP,IL);
A61P13/02 (EP,IL);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL);
A61P15/00 (EP,IL);
A61P15/10 (EP,IL);
A61P15/12 (EP,IL);
A61P17/02 (EP,IL);
A61P19/02 (EP,IL);
A61P21/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/06 (EP,IL);
A61P25/08 (EP,IL);
A61P25/16 (EP,IL);
A61P25/18 (EP,IL);
A61P25/20 (EP,IL);
A61P25/22 (EP,IL);
A61P25/24 (EP,IL);
A61P25/26 (EP,IL);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL);
A61P25/30 (EP,IL);
A61P27/16 (EP,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/02 (EP,IL);
A61P3/04 (EP,IL);
A61P31/04 (EP,IL);
A61P31/12 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/165, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4458, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON FLECAINID ALS ANTI-CONNEXIN-MITTEL UND POTENZIERUNG DER WIRKUNG EINES PSYCHOTROPEN MEDIKAMENTS | [2018/16] | English: | USE OF FLECAINIDE AS AN ANTI-CONNEXIN AGENT AND METHOD FOR POTENTIATING THE EFFECTS OF A PSYCHOTROPIC DRUG | [2018/16] | French: | UTILISATION DE FLÉCAÏNIDE COMME AGENT ANTI-CONNEXINE ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT LA POTENTIALISATION DES EFFETS D'UN MÉDICAMENT PSYCHOTROPE | [2018/16] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 24.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14742249.7 / EP3024458 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005039577 (XCEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2007062186 (UNIV ALABAMA [US], et al); | [AD]US2011172188 (MOUTHON FRANCK [FR], et al); |