EP3329912 - SUPPORTING ACTIVITIES OF DAILY LIVING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROENENDIJK, Martine Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 02 /
DE WILDE, Mattheus Cornelis Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 03 /
HAGEMAN, Robert Johan Joseph Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Utrecht / NL | 04 /
KAMPHUIS, Patrick Joseph Gerardus Hendrikus Uppsalalaan 12 3584 CT Ûtrecht / NL | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2018/23] | Application number, filing date | 17203742.6 | 20.06.2008 | [2018/23] | Priority number, date | WO2007NL50307 | 26.06.2007 Original published format: PCT/NL2007/050307 | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3329912 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/20, A23L33/00, A23L33/10, A23L33/16, A23L33/17, A61K31/14, A61K31/202, A61K31/7072, A61P25/28, A61P43/00 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/7072 (EP,BR,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,BR,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,BR,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,BR,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,BR,US);
A61K31/14 (EP,BR,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,BR,US);
A61K31/4415 (BR,US);
A61K31/519 (BR,US);
A61K31/70 (BR,US);
A61K31/7056 (BR,US);
A61K38/00 (BR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/14, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7072, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/23] | Title | German: | UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON ALLTAGSTÄTIGKEITEN | [2018/23] | English: | SUPPORTING ACTIVITIES OF DAILY LIVING | [2018/23] | French: | SOUTIEN AUX ACTIVITES DE LA VIE QUOTIDIENNE | [2018/23] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 27.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08766829.9 / EP2166882 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.02.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]WO03041701 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al); | [XI]US2005208179 (ALBRECHT DANIEL S [US], et al); | [XDI]EP1656839 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]); | [XDI]EP1666092 (TROMMSDORFF ARZNEIMITTEL [DE]); | [XDI]WO2006127620 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | [XI]WO2007008586 (MARTEK BIOSCIENCES CORP [US], et al); | [XDI]WO2007058538 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al); | [XP]EP1800675 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]); |