EP3345833 - CARGO HANDING SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2018/28] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Douglas Alan The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | 02 /
CLOS, William Robert The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | 03 /
HILLS, Karen L. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | 04 /
RIDDLE, Avery The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | 05 /
VANDEWALL, Cynthia A. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | [2023/22] |
Former [2018/28] | 01 /
BROWN, Douglas Alan The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | ||
02 /
CLOS, William Robert The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | |||
03 /
HILLS, Karen L. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | |||
04 /
RIDDLE, Avery The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | |||
05 /
VANDEWALL, Cynthia A. The Boeing Companz 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | Representative(s) | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bavariaring 17 80336 München / DE | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 17203779.8 | 27.11.2017 | [2018/28] | Priority number, date | US201715401451 | 09.01.2017 Original published format: US201715401451 | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345833 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3345833 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B64D9/00 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
B64D9/00 (EP,CN,US);
B64D2009/006 (EP,CN,US);
Y02T50/40 (EP,US);
Y02T50/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | FRACHTHANDHABUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2018/28] | English: | CARGO HANDING SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2018/28] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE MANIPULATION DE FRET | [2018/28] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 27.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | MC | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | LU | 27.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
IT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
IT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2735737 (IVANOV) [X] 1-5,10,12-14* pages 5-15; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US4170292 (LANG JOHN M [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10,12-14 * abstract *; | [XI]WO2014049590 (ISRAEL AEROSPACE IND LTD [IL]) [X] 1-6,8-15 * pages 16-30; figures 1-20 * [I] 7 |