EP3378375 - SYSTEM FOR ALTERING FUNCTIONS OF AT LEAST ONE SURGICAL DEVICE DEPENDENT UPON INFORMATION SAVED IN AN ENDOSCOPE RELATED TO THE ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stryker Corporation 2825 Airview Boulevard Kalamazoo, MI 49002 / US | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWRENCE, Hannah 1052 Summermist Court San Jose, California 95122 / US | 02 /
FEINGOLD, Benjamin 11422 E. Roadrunner Rd. Tucson, Arizona 85730 / US | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/39] | Provvisionato, Paolo Provvisionato & Co S.r.l. Piazza di Porta Mascarella 7 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 17203805.1 | 27.11.2017 | [2018/39] | Priority number, date | US201715467055 | 23.03.2017 Original published format: US201715467055 | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3378375 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
A61B1/00059 (EP,US);
A61B1/00096 (EP);
A61B1/00195 (EP);
A61B1/127 (EP);
A61B1/128 (EP);
G02B23/2423 (EP);
G02B23/2469 (EP);
G02B23/2476 (EP);
A61B1/00009 (EP,US);
A61B1/00013 (EP);
A61B1/00016 (EP);
A61B1/00089 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] |
Former [2018/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERÄNDERUNG VON FUNKTIONEN MINDESTENS EINER CHIRURGISCHEN VORRICHTUNG IN ABHÄNGIGKEIT VON IN EINEM ENDOSKOP IN BEZUG AUF DAS ENDOSKOP GESPEICHERTEN INFORMATIONEN | [2018/39] | English: | SYSTEM FOR ALTERING FUNCTIONS OF AT LEAST ONE SURGICAL DEVICE DEPENDENT UPON INFORMATION SAVED IN AN ENDOSCOPE RELATED TO THE ENDOSCOPE | [2018/39] | French: | SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE MODIFIER LES FONCTIONS D'AU MOINS UN DISPOSITIF CHIRURGICAL DÉPENDANT DES INFORMATIONS SAUVEGARDÉES DANS UN ENDOSCOPE LIÉ À L'ENDOSCOPE | [2018/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 26.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06125871 (FUJI PHOTO OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,13 * paragraphs [0031] - [0032] * * figure 12 *; | [X]US6092722 (HEINRICHS JEAN-PIERRE [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,10-14,19-23 * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 6 * * column 7, lines 13-63 * * column 8, lines 57-60 * * figures 4, 8, 9 *; | [X]US2007286764 (NOGUCHI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-11,13-18,21,22 * paragraphs [0061] - [0064] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2014200406 (BENNETT DAVID B [US], et al) [X] 1-4,13,19,20 * paragraphs [0025] - [0028] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0059] * * figures 1-3, 12 *; | [A]US2016015247 (IRION KLAUS-MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0079] - [0082] ** figure 1 *; | [E]EP3263014 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [E] 1,13 * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] * * paragraph [0074] * * figures 3, 4 * | by applicant | US8657809 |