EP3336124 - POLYARYLENE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials LLC 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILMORE, Christopher 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 02 /
RACHFORD, Aaron A. 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 03 /
MICHAEL-SAPIA, Elizabeth K. 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 04 /
LEE, Dong-Eun 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Jieqian 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 06 /
DING, Ping 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 07 /
KIM, Young-Seok 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2018/25] | Application number, filing date | 17204243.4 | 28.11.2017 | [2018/25] | Priority number, date | US201662434060P | 14.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662434060 P | [2018/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3336124 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/10, C08G61/12, C09D165/02, C08L65/02, H01L23/532 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
C08G61/12 (EP,CN,US);
C08L65/00 (CN,KR);
C08G61/02 (KR);
C08G61/10 (EP,US);
C08J3/24 (KR);
C08L65/02 (EP,US);
C09D165/00 (CN,KR);
C09D165/02 (EP,US);
C08G2261/124 (EP,US);
C08G2261/135 (EP,US);
C08G2261/142 (KR);
C08G2261/1424 (EP,US);
C08G2261/1426 (EP,US);
C08G2261/228 (EP,US);
C08G2261/312 (EP,US);
C08G2261/334 (US);
C08G2261/344 (EP,US);
C08G2261/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYARYLENZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2018/25] | English: | POLYARYLENE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2018/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE POLYARYLÈNE | [2018/25] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 28.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/49] | 24.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4400540 (REINHARDT BRUCE A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,12,13 * column 1, lines 11-13; example III; claim 1 *; | [X]JP2004292554 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-6,9-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 46] - [0053]; examples P1-P8, 1-4 *; | [X]US2005176915 (CHO HYUN-NAM [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,9-13 * paragraph [0002]; examples 35, 40, 43, 44 *; | [X]US7816482 (HIBBS MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12,13 * column 1, lines 18-29; figures 9-11; example 2 *; | [X]US2015038666 (MIYAZAKI TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9,12,13* paragraphs [0003] , [0 94] *; | [XP]EP3115392 (ROHM & HAAS ELECT MAT [US]) [XP] 1,2,5-7,9,10,12,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 32] , [0 35] , [0 49]; example all * | by applicant | WO8707286 | WO9710193 | US5965679 | US6288188 | US6646081 | WO2004073824 | US2016060393 |