Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10648606 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2020 | B2 | US2019162352 | 30.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17204274 | 29.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7171036B | Global Dossier | 15.11.2022 | B2 | JP2019100545 | 24.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP17204274 | 29.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3026090 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17204274 | 29.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3492545 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2021 | B1 | EP3492545 | 05.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17204274 | 29.11.2017 |