EP3492518 - METHOD FOR TREATING A POLYURETHANE FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Weicheng No.33 Qin Qiao Road Pudong District Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
DENG, Yan Room 102, No.14, Lane 165 Do Zhu An Bang Road Changning District Shanghai 200050 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Dongbo No.33 Qin Qiao Road Pudong District Shanghai 201206 / CN | 04 /
TANG, Min No.33 Qin Qiao Road Pudong District Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 17204306.9 | 29.11.2017 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3492518 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/40 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
C08J9/40 (EP);
C08J2201/036 (EP);
C08J2375/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] |
Former [2019/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES POLYURETHANSCHAUMSTOFFS | [2019/23] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING A POLYURETHANE FOAM | [2019/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MOUSSE DE POLYURÉTHANE | [2019/23] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 05.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/29] | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor | 04.07.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.07.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009249555 (DEWHURST ROBERT [GB], et al) [X] 1-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 3] - [0006] - [00 8] - [0015] - [0 25] - [0034] * * claims 1-5, 9, 10 * [I] 11,12; | [X]CN104761700 (KUNSHAN LIPU ELECTRONIC RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,11-14 * paragraph [0016] ** examples 1-6 * | by applicant | EP0007502 | EP0105576 | EP0826705 | WO0149779 | WO2014011375 | CN104231300 |