EP3493337 - VERTICAL CAVITY SURFACE EMITTING LASER (VCSEL) DEVICE WITH IMPROVED RELIABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/23] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIGL, Alexander c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17204632.8 | 30.11.2017 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3493337 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/022, H01S5/042, H01S5/183, H01S5/42 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
H01S5/183 (EP);
H01S5/02345 (EP,US);
H01S5/04254 (EP,US);
H01S5/18311 (EP);
H01S5/18394 (EP);
H01S5/426 (EP);
H01S2301/176 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT OBERFLÄCHENEMITTIERENDEM LASER MIT VERTIKALEM RESONATOR (VCSEL) MIT VERBESSERTER ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT | [2019/23] | English: | VERTICAL CAVITY SURFACE EMITTING LASER (VCSEL) DEVICE WITH IMPROVED RELIABILITY | [2019/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF LASER À CAVITÉ VERTICALE ÉMETTANT PAR LA SURFACE (VCSEL) AVEC UNE FIABILITÉ AMÉLIORÉE | [2019/23] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 14.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5696389 (ISHIKAWA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1,13,14 * abstract *; | [I]EP0905838 (CANON KK [JP]) [I] 1,7-9,13,14* abstract *; | [I]US2005100070 (NAKAYAMA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1,3,7-9,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0059] *; | [I]US2008279241 (OKI TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-3,6,13,14 * abstract *; | [I]WO2014189518 (JOSEPH JOHN R [US], et al) [I] 1,7-9,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] *; | [I]WO2016162236 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [I] 1,3-5,7-14 * abstract *; | [I]US2017201066 (CHEN HAOSHUO [US], et al) [I] 1,3,7-9,13,14 * abstract * |