EP3492611 - HIGH STRENGTH HOT-ROLLED STEEL & METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING HIGH STRENGTH HOT-ROLLED STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SSAB Technology AB P.O. Box 70 101 21 Stockholm / SE | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erik Nymann Törnbergsgatan 30 78462 Borlänge / SE | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17205153.4 | 04.12.2017 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3492611 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3492611 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C21D8/02, C21D1/20, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/46, C22C38/48, C22C38/50, C21D9/46 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
C22C38/00 (EP);
C22C38/58 (CN,KR,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,CN,KR);
C21D1/18 (CN);
C21D1/20 (EP,KR);
C21D11/005 (CN);
C21D8/0205 (CN);
C21D8/0226 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C21D8/0242 (EP,CN);
C21D8/0247 (CN);
C21D8/0263 (EP,CN,KR);
C21D9/46 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/46 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C21D2211/002 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C21D2211/005 (EP,CN,KR);
C21D2211/008 (EP,CN,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/23] | C22C38/00, C21D8/02, C21D1/20, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/46, C22C38/48, C22C38/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2019/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HOCHFESTER WARMGEWALZTER STAHL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHFESTEM WARMGEWALZTEM STAHL | [2019/23] | English: | HIGH STRENGTH HOT-ROLLED STEEL & METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING HIGH STRENGTH HOT-ROLLED STEEL | [2019/23] | French: | ACIER LAMINÉ À CHAUD À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ACIER LAMINÉ À CHAUD À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE | [2019/23] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 04.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2017 | AL | 28.10.2020 | CY | 28.10.2020 | DK | 28.10.2020 | EE | 28.10.2020 | FI | 28.10.2020 | HR | 28.10.2020 | LT | 28.10.2020 | LV | 28.10.2020 | MC | 28.10.2020 | MK | 28.10.2020 | MT | 28.10.2020 | RO | 28.10.2020 | RS | 28.10.2020 | SI | 28.10.2020 | SK | 28.10.2020 | SM | 28.10.2020 | IE | 04.12.2020 | LU | 04.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | BG | 28.01.2021 | NO | 28.01.2021 | GR | 29.01.2021 | IS | 28.02.2021 | PT | 01.03.2021 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 04.12.2017 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
MT | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
LU | 04.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
LU | 04.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
LU | 04.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
LU | 04.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
LU | 04.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
LU | 04.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 04.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | DK | 28.10.2020 | |
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | DK | 28.10.2020 | |
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 28.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IDA]US6364968 (YASUHARA EIKO [JP], et al) [ID] 1,6-14 * abstract * [A] 2-5; | [IA]EP1865083 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [I] 1,4-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0046] * [A] 2,3; | [A]EP2617852 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | by applicant | US6364968 | EP2436797 |