EP3345998 - IMMUNOCOMPATIBLE CHORIONIC MEMBRANE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osiris Therapeutics, Inc. 7015 Albert Einstein Drive Columbia, MD 21046 / US | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOM, Samson 5600 Highcroft Dr. Cary, NC 27519-8829 / US | 02 /
DANILKOVITCH, Alla 9489 Good Lion Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | 03 /
YOO, Dana 6749 Darrells Grant Place Falls Church, VA 22043 / US | 04 /
JANSEN, Timothy 5343 Tallman Ave, NW 329 Seattle, Wa 98107 / US | 05 /
KUANG, Jin-Qiang 4109 Flintlock CT Glenelg, Maryland 21737 / US | 06 /
MARCONI, Jennifer Michelle 7955 Shady Grove Way Pasadena, MD 21122 / US | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/28] | 01 /
TOM, Samson 72 Liberty Ridge Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | ||
02 /
DANILKOVITCH, Alla 9489 Good Lion Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | |||
03 /
YOO, Dana 6749 Darrells Grant Place Falls Church, VA 22043 / US | |||
04 /
JANSEN, Timothy 93 High Street, Apt. 3 Portsmouth, NH 03801 / US | |||
05 /
KUANG, Jin-Qiang 10679 Hillingdon Road Woodstock, MD 21163 / US | |||
06 /
MARCONI, Jennifer Michelle 7955 Shady Grove Way Pasadena, MD 21122 / US | Representative(s) | Smith & Nephew Group Legal Department PO Box 81 101 Hessle Road Hull HU3 2BN / GB | [2024/33] |
Former [2018/28] | Thomann, William John ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17205385.2 | 18.02.2011 | [2018/28] | Priority number, date | US20100338489P | 18.02.2010 Original published format: US 338489 P | US20100338464P | 18.02.2010 Original published format: US 338464 P | US20100369562P | 30.07.2010 Original published format: US 369562 P | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345998 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3345998 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02, A61K38/18, A61K38/39, A61K38/57, A61K35/50, C12N5/0775, A61P17/00, A61P17/02, A61P43/00 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
A01N1/0221 (EP,US);
A61K35/28 (US);
A61K35/50 (EP,US);
A61K38/1825 (EP,US);
A61K38/1841 (EP,US);
A61K38/39 (EP,US);
A61K38/57 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N5/0605 (EP,US);
C12N2500/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/28] | C12N5/071, A01N1/02, A61K38/39, A61K38/57, A61K35/50, A61K38/18, A61K35/28, C12N5/073 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | IMMUNKOMPATIBLE CHORIONMEMBRANPRODUKTE | [2018/28] | English: | IMMUNOCOMPATIBLE CHORIONIC MEMBRANE PRODUCTS | [2018/28] | French: | PRODUITS DE MEMBRANE CHORIONIQUE IMMUNOCOMPATIBLE | [2018/28] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 09.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11745341.5 / EP2536824 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005007835 (ZEPHAN BIOPHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [A]US2008046095 (DANIEL JOHN [US]); | by applicant | WO2009132186 | US2010098743 |