EP3326973 - A DEBORONATED MWW ZEOLITIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/22] | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A ZEOLITIC MATERIAL | ||
[2020/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2022/43] |
Former [2018/22] | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Ulrich c/o BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | 02 /
Parvulescu, Andrei-Nicolae c/o BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | 03 /
Yang, Jeff 42 Monmouth Rd Glen Rock, 07452 / US | 04 /
Lützel, Hans-Jürgen c/o BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | 05 /
Uhl, Georg c/o BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | 06 /
Dumser, Stefan Otgart Str. 32 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2022/43] |
Former [2018/22] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17205602.0 | 05.02.2013 | [2018/22] | Priority number, date | EP20120154169 | 07.02.2012 Original published format: EP 12154169 | EP20120189035 | 18.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12189035 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3326973 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3326973 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C01B39/02, C01B39/12, B01J29/86, B01J29/89, B01J37/00 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
C01B39/026 (EP,KR);
C01B39/02 (CN,RU);
B01J29/86 (EP,KR);
B01J29/89 (EP,KR);
B01J37/0045 (EP,KR);
C01B39/12 (EP,CN,KR,RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2018/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EIN DEBORONIERTES MWW-ZEOLITISCHES MATERIAL | [2020/52] | English: | A DEBORONATED MWW ZEOLITIC MATERIAL | [2020/52] | French: | UN MATÉRIAU ZÉOLITIQUE MWW DEBORONÉ | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/22] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ZEOLITHISCHEN MATERIALS | ||
Former [2018/22] | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A ZEOLITIC MATERIAL | ||
Former [2018/22] | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN MATERIAU ZEOLITIQUE | Examination procedure | 14.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 30.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13702241.4 / EP2812282 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IE | 05.02.2023 | LU | 05.02.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
LU | 05.02.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
LU | 05.02.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
MC | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NO | 26.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4526880 (CHU POCHEN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8-12,14-17,19 * column 6; examples 1-9 * [A] 4,5,7,18 [I] 13; | [XI]EP0234759 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-17,19 * the whole document * [I] 18; | [XI]US5047141 (CHU POCHEN [US]) [X] 1-17,19 * the whole document * [I] 18; | [A]US5053211 (HADDAD MUIN S [US]) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5324702 (YOO JIN S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-17,19 * column 3 - column 5; examples 1-13 * [A] 4,7,18; | [XAI]DE19828851 (HOELDERICH W F [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,8,9,13,15-17,19 * page 3, lines 34-66; examples 1-7 * [A] 4,7,18 [I] 6,10-12,14; | [XDI]WO0228774 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [XD] 1-17,19 * example 1; table 2 * [I] 18; | [XDI]WO02057181 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]) [XD] 1-17 * the whole document * [I] 18; | [XI]WO03074421 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-17,19 * example 1 * * the whole document * [I] 18; | [XDI]WO2004069746 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [XD] 1-17,19 * the whole document * [I] 18; | [XDI]EP1490300 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [XD] 1-17,19 * the whole document * [I] 18; | [A]US2011313226 (YILMAZ BILGE [US], et al) [A] 7,19* paragraph [0129] *; | [XDI] - PENG WU ET AL, "Preparation of B-free Ti MWW through reversible structural conversion", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS - CHEMCOM; [6015D], ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, GB, ISSN 1359-7345, (20020101), pages 1026 - 1027, (20020411), XP002533316 [XD] 1-17,19 * the whole document * [I] 18 | by applicant | US4954325 | WO0228774 | WO02057181 | EP1324948 | EP1485321 | EP1490300 | US2006105903 | - P. WU et al., Studies in Surface Science and Catalysis, (20040000), vol. 154, pages 2581 - 2588 | - P. WU et al., Chemical Communications, (20020000), pages 1026 - 1027 | - L. LIU et al., Microporous and Mesoporous Materials, (20060000), vol. 94, pages 304 - 312 | - M.E. LEONOWICZ; J.A. LAWTON; S.L. LAWTON; M.K. RUBIN, Science, (19940000), vol. 264, page 1910 | - S.L. LAWTON; M.E. LEONOWICZ; R.D. PARTIDGE; P. CHU; M.K. RUBIN, Micropor. Mesopor. Mater., (19980000), vol. 23, page 109 | - W.M. MEIER; D.H. OLSON; CH. BAERLOCHER, Atlas of Zeolite Structure Types, Elsevier, (20010000), page 202,203 | - P. WU et al., "Hydrothermal Synthesis of a novel Titanosilicate with MWW Topology", Chemistry Letters, (20000000), doi:doi:10.1246/cl.2000.774, pages 774 - 775, XP002204294 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/cl.2000.774 | - S.L. LAWTON et al., Micropor. Mesopor. Mater., (19980000), vol. 23, page 109 |