EP3459392 - SAFETY SYSTEM CAPABLE OF PREVENTING ACCIDENT CONCERNING CHEST OF DRAWERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kim, Byung Chul 22, Cheongjeon-daero 14-gil Jecheon-shi Chungcheongbuk-do 27153 / KR | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 17205667.3 | 06.12.2017 | [2019/13] | Priority number, date | KR20170121895 | 21.09.2017 Original published format: KR 20170121895 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3459392 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47B67/04, E05B65/463, // A47B97/00 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
A47B67/04 (EP,KR,US);
A47B88/50 (CN,KR,US);
A47B91/02 (KR);
A47B91/06 (US);
A47B95/00 (KR);
A47B97/00 (US);
E05B65/463 (EP,US);
G05B19/042 (CN);
A47B2097/008 (EP,US);
A47B2220/0091 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUR VERHINDERUNG EINES UNFALLS BEZÜGLICH EINER KOMMODE FÄHIGES SICHERHEITSSYSTEM | [2019/13] | English: | SAFETY SYSTEM CAPABLE OF PREVENTING ACCIDENT CONCERNING CHEST OF DRAWERS | [2019/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SÉCURITÉ DE PRÉVENTION D'ACCIDENT CONCERNANT UNE COMMODE À TIROIRS | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 08.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/45] | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102006004559 (STIEFEL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-3 *; | [ID]KR101694922B (PARK HEE JUN [KR]) [ID] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03057597 (SARRAZIN IND [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | KR101694922B |