EP3332977 - PRINTING APPARATUS AND PRINTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Toru c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/24] | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 17205731.7 | 06.12.2017 | [2018/24] | Priority number, date | JP20160237334 | 07.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016237334 | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3332977 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3332977 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/407, B41J11/00, B41J2/21, B41J29/13 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
B41J3/4078 (EP);
B41J11/007 (EP);
B41J2/21 (EP);
B41J29/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2018/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DRUCKVORRICHTUNG UND DRUCKVERFAHREN | [2018/24] | English: | PRINTING APPARATUS AND PRINTING METHOD | [2018/24] | French: | IMPRIMANTE ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION | [2018/24] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 30.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | LU | 06.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SI | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009256877 (TAKAHASHI TORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0046] - [0053] - [ 0064] - [0066]; figures 2A, 2B, 3, 7 * [I] 2-6,9,10; | [A]US2014192110 (TAKIGUCHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 4-6* paragraphs [0008] - [0012] - [ 0031] , [ 0032] , [ 0060] - [0065]; figure 3 * | Examination | US2005168515 | US2009167833 | by applicant | JP2013193303 | JP2015020408 |