EP3329892 - MEDICAL AIR MATRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Picard Healthcare Technology (Dongguan) Co. Ltd. No.149 Chunfung Rd. Longbelin Tangxia Dongguan, Guangdong Prov. / CN | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIANG, Kueng-Neng NO. 46 ALY 9 LN 22 WENDE RD TAIPEI / TW | 02 /
LIANG, Hslu-Lun NO. 25 LN 66 JUIKUANG RD TAIPEI / TW | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Muttock, Neil John 6 Kings Avenue Muswell Hill London N10 1PB / GB | [2018/23] | Application number, filing date | 17205768.9 | 18.06.2012 | [2018/23] | Priority number, date | EP20110170191 | 16.06.2011 Original published format: EP 11170191 | EP20110170166 | 16.06.2011 Original published format: EP 11170166 | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3329892 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3329892 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/057, A61G7/02, // A47C27/08, A47C27/10, A61G7/05, A61G7/00 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
A61G7/05776 (EP,US);
A61G7/057 (RU);
A61G7/05769 (CN);
A47C21/00 (US);
A47C21/048 (US);
A47C27/081 (US);
A47C27/10 (US);
A61G7/00 (EP,US);
A61G7/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE LUFTMATRATZE | [2018/23] | English: | MEDICAL AIR MATRESS | [2018/23] | French: | MATELAS D'AIR MEDICAL | [2018/23] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 06.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12799891.2 / EP2726047 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5588167 (PAHNO DEMETRIOS A [US], et al); | [XI]US5611096 (BARTLETT ALAN L [US], et al); | [X]WO0215835 (PARK HOUSE HEALTHCARE LTD [GB], et al); | [I]WO0238099 (TEMPUR WORLD INC [US], et al); | [A]US2002170117 (FLICK ROLAND E [US], et al); | [I]US2007094805 (DAVIS DAVID T [US]); | [X]US2007143928 (BIGGIE LYDIA B [US], et al); | [A]GB2469540 (OUTRAM FRANCIS WILLIAM [GB]) |