EP3340065 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE STATE OF A SYSTEM, METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN OPTIMAL PROJECTION METHOD AND DEVICE IMPLEMENTING SAID METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lespinats, Sylvain 134 rue de Genève 73100 AIX-LES-BAINS / FR | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25 rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 17205849.7 | 07.12.2017 | [2018/26] | Priority number, date | FR20160063011 | 21.12.2016 Original published format: FR 1663011 | [2018/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3340065 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/10, G06K9/62 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
G06F17/10 (EP,US);
G06F18/2137 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] |
Former [2018/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES ZUSTANDS EINES SYSTEMS, VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES OPTIMALEN PROJEKTIONSVERFAHRENS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMSETZUNG DIESER VERFAHREN | [2018/26] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE STATE OF A SYSTEM, METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN OPTIMAL PROJECTION METHOD AND DEVICE IMPLEMENTING SAID METHODS | [2018/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE L'ÉTAT D'UN SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE MÉTHODE DE PROJECTION OPTIMALE ET DISPOSITIF METTANT EN OEUVRE LESDITS PROCÉDÉS | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 07.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.07.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 05.07.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.07.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011047889 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, ligne 2 - page 2, ligne 26 * * page 6, lignes 7-20 * * page 12, ligne 18 - page 13, ligne 21 * * page 18, ligne 33 - page 19, ligne 9 * * revendication 1 ; figures 1 et 3 *; | [A]WO2011048219 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, lignes 2-7 * * page 3, lignes 5-35 * * page 4, ligne 30 - page 5, ligne 2 * * page 6, lignes 14-35 * * page 10, ligne 28 - page 14, ligne 33; figures 1, 1bis ** page 15, ligne 1 - page 16, ligne 33; figures 2, 3 * | by applicant | - R. SIBSON, A brief description of natural neighbor interpolation (Chapter2), Interpreting Multivariate Data. Chichester: John Wiley, (19810000), pages 21 - 36 | - HINTON, G. E.; ROWEIS, S. T., "Stochastic neighbor embedding", Advances in neural information processing systems, (20020000), pages 833 - 840 | - "Mapping from the neighbourhood network", Neurocomputing, vol. 72, no. 13-15, pages 2964 - 2978 | - "CheckViz: Sanity Check and Topological Clues for Linear and Non-Linear Mappings", LESPINATS, S.; AUPETIT, M., Computer Graphics Forum, Blackwell Publishing Ltd, (20110300), vol. 30, pages 113 - 125 |