EP3495346 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CALCIUM METHIONINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2019/50] |
Former [2019/24] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Daniel 11817 Heathmere Crescent Midlothian, VA 23113 / US | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management PB 84/339 Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 17205981.8 | 07.12.2017 | [2019/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3495346 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07C319/20, C07C323/58, A23P10/20 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
C07C319/20 (EP);
A23K20/00 (EP);
A23K20/10 (EP);
A23P10/20 (EP);
A23P10/22 (EP);
C07C323/58 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C319/20, C07C323/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CALCIUMMETHIONINAT | [2019/24] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CALCIUM METHIONINATE | [2019/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MÉTHIONINATE DE CALCIUM | [2019/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 20.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0130281 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 15,16 * Seite 10, Zeile 11 - Seite 11, Zeile 5);; example 3; claim 1 * [Y] 1-14; | [Y]DE3335218 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * Seite 8, Zeilen 5-16, 30-35;; examples 1-7; claims 1-9 *; | [Y]DE19707380 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * Seite 4, Zeilen 8-35) * | by applicant | DE3105009 | EP0130281 | WO2007034065 | DE19707380 | US3617297 |