EP3336006 - USE OF FOOD PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/25] | FOOD PACKAGING | ||
[2019/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scheidt, Markus Weizenstr. 8 32120 Oetinghausen / DE | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [2018/25] | Application number, filing date | 17206079.0 | 08.12.2017 | [2018/25] | Priority number, date | DE201620107092U | 16.12.2016 Original published format: DE 202016107092 U | [2018/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3336006 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3336006 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/30, B65D81/24, B65D81/26, B32B1/00, B65D65/40 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
B65D75/30 (EP);
B32B27/06 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B3/266 (EP);
B65D65/406 (EP);
B65D75/305 (EP);
B65D81/24 (EP);
B65D81/263 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/724 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2439/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] |
Former [2018/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER LEBENSMITTELVERPACKUNG | [2019/28] | English: | USE OF FOOD PACKAGING | [2019/28] | French: | UTILISATION D'EMBALLAGES ALIMENTAIRES | [2019/28] |
Former [2018/25] | LEBENSMITTELVERPACKUNG | ||
Former [2018/25] | FOOD PACKAGING | ||
Former [2018/25] | EMBALLAGES ALIMENTAIRES | Examination procedure | 17.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 17.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2017 | AL | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | ES | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | IT | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | NL | 04.12.2019 | PL | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SE | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | IE | 08.12.2019 | LU | 08.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | FR | 04.02.2020 | BG | 04.03.2020 | NO | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.12.2017 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.12.2017 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.12.2017 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
IT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
PL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
FR | 04.02.2020 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
ES | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
NL | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 04.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3744627 (STOOKSBURY D, et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, line 4 - column 4, line 35 * * figures 1-10 *; | [Y]EP0339593 (HIMONT INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 10 * * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]WO9637419 (SCHOELLER PLAST AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 1 - page 5 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]JP2008155952 (IMADA TETSUO, et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0027] ** figures 1,4 * |