|
15.03.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.03.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.01.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.01.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.01.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
24.01.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
22.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2019 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.06.2018 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |