Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10589616 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2020 | B2 | US2019118636 | 25.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20170139145 | 25.10.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102429012B | Global Dossier | 04.08.2022 | B1 | KR20190046047 | 07.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20170139145 | 25.10.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109707818B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2022 | B | CN109707818 | 03.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20170139145 | 25.10.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3477155 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2020 | B1 | EP3477155 | 01.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20170139145 | 25.10.2017 |