EP3333338 - MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR BUILDING PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/24] | MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR FLOOR PANELS | ||
[2023/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceraloc Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 64 Viken / SE | [2021/27] |
Former [2018/24] | For all designated states Ceraloc Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERVAN, Tony Östermalmsgatan 89 SE-114 59 STOCKHOLM / SE | 02 /
PERVAN, Darko Bygatan 30 SE-263 61 VIKEN / SE | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Välinge Innovation AB Patent Department Prästavägen 513 263 64 Viken / SE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 17206318.2 | 14.08.2012 | [2018/24] | Priority number, date | SE20110050739 | 15.08.2011 Original published format: SE 1150739 | US201161523571P | 15.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161523571 P | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3333338 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3333338 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, E04F15/04 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
E04F15/02 (EP,RU);
E04F2201/0146 (EP);
E04F2201/0547 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Title | German: | MECHANISCHES ARRETIERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR BAUPLATTEN | [2023/19] | English: | MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR BUILDING PANELS | [2023/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE MÉCANIQUE POUR PANNEAUX DE CONSTRUCTION | [2023/19] |
Former [2018/24] | MECHANISCHES ARRETIERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR BODENPLATTEN | ||
Former [2018/24] | MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR FLOOR PANELS | ||
Former [2018/24] | SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE MÉCANIQUE POUR PANNEAUX DE PLANCHER | Examination procedure | 11.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 11.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12824478.7 / EP2744953 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RO | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RO | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006043893 (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE], et al) [I] 10-12* figures 6c,7b-7d *; | [I]DE102007032885 (FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [MT]) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043]; figures 4a-4b * |