EP3495409 - POLYPROPYLENE COMPOSITION COMPRISING CARBONACEOUS STRUCTURES AND HAVING IMPROVED MECHANICAL PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis AG Wagramerstrasse 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | [2019/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gkourmpis, Thomas Norra Krokslättsgatan 11 412 64 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
Gitsas, Antonios Borealis Polyolefine GmbH St.-Peter-Straße 25 4021 Linz / AT | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/24] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17206398.4 | 11.12.2017 | [2019/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3495409 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/04 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08K2201/001 (EP);
C08K2201/003 (EP);
C08K2201/006 (EP);
C08K2201/016 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L23/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYPROPYLENZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIE KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGE STRUKTUREN UMFASST UND VERBESSERTE MECHANISCHE EIGENSCHAFTEN AUFWEIST | [2019/24] | English: | POLYPROPYLENE COMPOSITION COMPRISING CARBONACEOUS STRUCTURES AND HAVING IMPROVED MECHANICAL PROPERTIES | [2019/24] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYPROPYLENE COMPRENANT DES STRUCTURES CARBONÉES ET AYANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS MÉCANIQUES AMÉLIORÉES | [2019/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/35] | 21.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO03002652 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-19 * tables 1, 2, 4 ** claim 25 *; | [X]US2009072448 (SHI JINJUN [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraph [0071]; claim 10 * * paragraph [0041]; claim 14 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 30] - [0033] * | by applicant | US2002054995 | WO03002652 | WO03024602 | US2004127621 | US2006231792 | US2006241237 | - SCHNIEPP, Journal of Physical Chemistry B, (20060000), vol. 110, page 8535 | - STANKOVICH et al., Nature, (20060000), vol. 442, page 282 | - SCHNIEPP, Journal of Physical Chemistry B, (20060000), vol. 110, page 853 |