EP3495153 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PREPARATION OF LAMINATES WITH SYNCHRONOUS PORES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.03.2025 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2025 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 16.04.2025 [2025/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. SmartCity Malta SCM01 Office 406 Ricasoli Kalkara SCM1001 / MT | [2019/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALWA, Norbert Birkenweg 18a 32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE | 02 /
HASCH, Joachim Alice und Hella Hirsch Ring 20 10317 Berlin / DE | 03 /
STIEWE, Bernd Steinheimer Str. 41 33039 Nieheim / DE | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2019/24] | Application number, filing date | 17206407.3 | 11.12.2017 | [2019/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3495153 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3495153 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3495153 | Date: | 16.04.2025 | Language: | DE | [2025/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, B44C1/24, B44C5/04 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
B41M5/0005 (EP,US);
B32B41/00 (US);
B32B21/06 (US);
B41F1/265 (US);
B44C1/24 (EP,US);
B44C5/043 (US);
B44C5/0469 (EP,US);
B44C5/0492 (US);
B44C5/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHICHTSTOFFEN MIT SYNCHRONPORE | [2019/24] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE PREPARATION OF LAMINATES WITH SYNCHRONOUS PORES | [2019/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE MATÉRIAUX STRATIFIÉS DOTÉS DE PORES SYNCHRONES | [2019/24] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 05.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22158023.6 / EP4019263 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.12.2022
06.12.2023
WITHDRAWN Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. OG Weiberndorf 20 6380 St. Johann in Tirol / AT Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/02] |
Former [2023/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.12.2022
04.01.2023
ADMISSIBLE Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. OG Weiberndorf 20 6380 St. Johann in Tirol / AT Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | 17.01.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.05.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.05.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.06.2024 | 15.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 12.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.10.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.10.2024 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.01.2025 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2017 | AL | 30.03.2022 | CY | 30.03.2022 | DK | 30.03.2022 | EE | 30.03.2022 | FI | 30.03.2022 | HR | 30.03.2022 | LT | 30.03.2022 | LV | 30.03.2022 | MC | 30.03.2022 | MK | 30.03.2022 | MT | 30.03.2022 | RS | 30.03.2022 | SI | 30.03.2022 | SK | 30.03.2022 | SM | 30.03.2022 | BG | 30.06.2022 | NO | 30.06.2022 | GR | 01.07.2022 | IS | 30.07.2022 | IE | 11.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.12.2017 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
MK | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
IE | 11.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 11.12.2017 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MK | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
IE | 11.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 11.12.2017 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
IE | 11.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 11.12.2017 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
IE | 11.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
IE | 11.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | EE | 30.03.2022 | |
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | EE | 30.03.2022 | |
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | EE | 30.03.2022 | |
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 30.03.2022 | |
NO | 30.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013295352 (THIERS BERNARD [BE], et al); | [A]DE102014211769 (KAINDL FLOORING GMBH [AT]); | [A]WO2016050696 (TARKETT GDL SA [LU]) | by applicant | WO9731775 | DE102004054765 | Opposition | WO9731775 | WO03080337 | DE102004054765 | US2013295352 | WO2014014400 | DE102012018569 | DE102014211769 | WO2016050696 |