EP3330967 - IMPROVED FREQUENCY BAND EXTENSION IN AN AUDIO FREQUENCY SIGNAL DECODER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2018/23] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANIEWSKA, Magdalena Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
RAGOT, Stéphane Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/15] |
Former [2018/23] | de Haan, Poul Erik Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 17206567.4 | 04.02.2015 | [2018/23] | Priority number, date | FR20140050969 | 07.02.2014 Original published format: FR 1450969 | [2018/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3330967 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3330967 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/038 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
G10L21/038 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B41K3/56 (US);
B41K1/04 (US);
B41K1/10 (US);
B41K1/12 (US);
B41K1/38 (US);
B41K1/40 (US);
B41K1/42 (US);
G10L19/0204 (KR,US);
G10L19/0212 (KR);
G10L25/21 (KR,US);
G10L19/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] |
Former [2018/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE AUSDEHNUNG EINES FREQUENZBANDS IN EINEM DEKODIERER VON AUDIOFREQUENZSIGNALEN | [2018/23] | English: | IMPROVED FREQUENCY BAND EXTENSION IN AN AUDIO FREQUENCY SIGNAL DECODER | [2018/23] | French: | EXTENSION AMÉLIORÉE DE BANDE DE FRÉQUENCE DANS UN DÉCODEUR DE SIGNAUX AUDIOFRÉQUENCES | [2018/23] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 06.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.09.2023 | 06.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15705687.0 / EP3103116 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001044722 (GUSTAFSSON HARALD [SE], et al); |