EP3357959 - LOW LOSS PRE-PREGS AND LAMINATES AND COMPOSITIONS USEFUL FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arlon LLC 1100 Governor Lea Road Bear, DE 19701 / US | [2020/45] |
Former [2018/32] | For all designated states Arlon 1100 Governor Lea Road Bear, 19701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Daniel 3018 Clairmont Ave Fullerton, CA 92835 / US | 02 /
NAJJAR, Sam 33095 Bradcliff Ct. Yucaipa, CA 92399 / US | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Arends, William Gerrit Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2020/48] |
Former [2018/32] | Zvesper, Thomas Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17206639.1 | 09.06.2010 | [2018/32] | Priority number, date | US20090483166 | 11.06.2009 Original published format: US 483166 | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357959 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3357959 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/03, C08J5/24, H01B3/40, // C08K3/36, C08K5/523, C08L79/04 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
H01B3/40 (EP,US);
C08J5/249 (EP,US);
H05K1/0298 (US);
H05K1/03 (US);
H05K1/0353 (EP,US);
H05K1/0373 (US);
C08J2379/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K5/523 (EP,US);
C08L79/04 (EP,US);
H05K2201/012 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249955 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31525 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31529 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31721 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31725 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/32] | C08K3/00, C08K5/00, C08J5/24, H05K1/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] |
Former [2018/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PREPREGS UND LAMINATE MIT GERINGEM VERLUST SOWIE ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON NÜTZLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2018/32] | English: | LOW LOSS PRE-PREGS AND LAMINATES AND COMPOSITIONS USEFUL FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF | [2018/32] | French: | PRÉ-IMPRÉGNÉS ET STRATIFIÉS À FAIBLE PERTE ET COMPOSITIONS UTILES POUR LEURS PRÉPARATIONS | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 07.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10786805.1 / EP2440610 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2010 | AL | 25.11.2020 | AT | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | CZ | 25.11.2020 | DK | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | ES | 25.11.2020 | HR | 25.11.2020 | IT | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | MK | 25.11.2020 | NL | 25.11.2020 | PL | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | SM | 25.11.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | NO | 25.02.2021 | GR | 26.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | PT | 25.03.2021 | IE | 09.06.2021 | LU | 09.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | FR | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 09.06.2010 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
IE | 09.06.2021 | ||
LU | 09.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
IE | 09.06.2021 | ||
LU | 09.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
IE | 09.06.2021 | ||
LU | 09.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
IE | 09.06.2021 | ||
LU | 09.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
FR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
IE | 09.06.2021 | ||
LU | 09.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 09.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | NO | 25.02.2021 | |
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | PT | 25.03.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004025743 (WAKIZAKA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [Y]US2005019554 (ORIKABE HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0010] , [0040] , [0088] , [0104] , [0124] *; | [A]US2006147719 (RUBINSZTAJN SLAWOMIR [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0021] *; | [A]WO2007067649 (ISOLA USA CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0040] , [0053] , [0054] *; | [Y]WO2007080998 (FUSHIMI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2007270151 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0013] *; | [Y]US2008009211 (HIMES MATTHEW RAYMOND [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0011] , [0023] , [0077] , [0076] *; | [YP]US2009170983 (TADA YUJI [JP], et al) [YP] 1-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0016] , [0142] , [0143] , [0145] , [0148] , [0152] * | by applicant | US5358992 | US5447988 | US5489641 | US5646241 | US5718941 | US5753748 |