EP3340483 - ANTENNA FOR DOWNHOLE COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weatherford U.K. Limited Gotham Road East Leake Loughborough Leicestershire LE12 6JX / GB | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARKSON, Hugh The Schoolhouse King Edward Banff Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire AB45 3ND / GB | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Moreland, David Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17208238.0 | 18.12.2017 | [2018/26] | Priority number, date | GB20160022186 | 23.12.2016 Original published format: GB 201622186 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3340483 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3340483 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, G01V3/28, E21B47/13 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
G01V3/28 (EP,US);
H01Q1/04 (GB);
E21B41/00 (GB);
E21B47/13 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (GB);
H01Q7/00 (GB,US);
H04B5/43 (EP);
H04B5/72 (EP,US);
H04B5/73 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/26] | H04B5/00, E21B47/12, G01V3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Title | German: | ANTENNE FÜR BOHRLOCHKOMMUNIKATION | [2018/26] | English: | ANTENNA FOR DOWNHOLE COMMUNICATION | [2018/26] | French: | ANTENNE POUR COMMUNICATION DE FOND DE TROU | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 18.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 02 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 28.01.2020 | [2020/49] |
Former [2020/11] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 09.01.2020 | ||
ID: | 02 | ||
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 28.01.2020 | ||
[2020/49] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2017 | AL | 28.10.2020 | AT | 28.10.2020 | CY | 28.10.2020 | CZ | 28.10.2020 | EE | 28.10.2020 | ES | 28.10.2020 | FI | 28.10.2020 | HR | 28.10.2020 | LT | 28.10.2020 | LV | 28.10.2020 | MC | 28.10.2020 | MK | 28.10.2020 | MT | 28.10.2020 | NL | 28.10.2020 | PL | 28.10.2020 | RO | 28.10.2020 | RS | 28.10.2020 | SE | 28.10.2020 | SI | 28.10.2020 | SK | 28.10.2020 | SM | 28.10.2020 | TR | 28.10.2020 | IE | 18.12.2020 | LU | 18.12.2020 | FR | 28.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | BG | 28.01.2021 | GR | 29.01.2021 | IS | 28.02.2021 | PT | 01.03.2021 | DE | 01.07.2021 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.12.2017 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
MT | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
TR | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 18.12.2020 | ||
LU | 18.12.2020 | ||
FR | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
DE | 01.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 18.12.2020 | ||
LU | 18.12.2020 | ||
FR | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
DE | 01.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 18.12.2020 | ||
LU | 18.12.2020 | ||
FR | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
DE | 01.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 18.12.2020 | ||
LU | 18.12.2020 | ||
FR | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
DE | 01.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 18.12.2020 | ||
LU | 18.12.2020 | ||
FR | 28.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
DE | 01.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 18.12.2020 | ||
LU | 18.12.2020 | ||
FR | 28.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
IE | 18.12.2020 | ||
LU | 18.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 28.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2004263414 (CHEN KUO-CHIANG [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,10,12,20 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 1a,1b,2-8 * [Y] 13-19 [I] 5,8,11; | [A]US2006145700 (TABANOU JACQUES R [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * figures 1,5,6 *; | [A]US2013181799 (DEVILLE BENOIT [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0032] ** figures 1-10 *; | [YA]US2016258274 (BITTAR MICHAEL S [US], et al) [Y] 13-19 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0090] * * figures 1-3,4A,5,6A,9A-9C * [A] 1-12,20 | Examination | US2012273192 |