EP3340125 - TEMPORALLY ENCODING A STATIC SPATIAL IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Chit Kwan 2323 Eastridge Ave, Apt. 521 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
CHINYA, Gautham N 125 SE 49TH CT Hillsboro, OR 97123 / US | 03 /
SRINIVASA, Narayan 5626 NW Primino Ave Portland, OR 97229 / US | [2018/28] |
Former [2018/26] | 01 /
LIN, Chit Kwan 3 HANOVER SQ APT 19E NEW YORK, NY New York 10004 / US | ||
02 /
CHINYA, Gautham N 125 SE 49TH CT HILLSBORO, OR Oregon 97123 / US | |||
03 /
SRINIVASA, Narayan 5626 NW Primino Ave Portland, OR Oregon 97229 / US | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 17208276.0 | 18.12.2017 | [2018/26] | Priority number, date | US201615385125 | 20.12.2016 Original published format: US201615385125 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3340125 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
G06N3/049 (EP,US);
G06F18/2155 (US);
G06N3/088 (EP,US);
H04N19/129 (US);
H04N19/182 (US);
G06T2207/20084 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] |
Former [2018/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEITLICHE CODIERUNG EINES STATISCHEN RAUMBILDES | [2018/26] | English: | TEMPORALLY ENCODING A STATIC SPATIAL IMAGE | [2018/26] | French: | CODAGE TEMPOREL D'UNE IMAGE SPATIALE STATIQUE | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 31.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 31.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 21.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013106074 (BRAIN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,13-15 * paragraphs [0062] , [0088] , [0089] , [0092] , [0096] , [0097] , [0101] , [0103] , [0123] , [0124] , [0127] - paragraphs [0129] , [0132] , [0147]; figure 2 * [I] 8,10-12; | [XI] - AMIRHOSSEIN TAVANAEI ET AL, "A Minimal Spiking Neural Network to Rapidly Train and Classify Handwritten Digits in Binary and 10-Digit Tasks", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ADVANCED RESEARCH IN ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, (2015), vol. 4, no. 7, doi:10.14569/IJARAI.2015.040701, ISSN 2165-4050, XP055473655 [X] 1-3,14,15 * page 2, column LH, line 18 - page 4, column RH, line 18; figures 2,3 * [I] 4-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.14569/IJARAI.2015.040701 | [XI] - DAQI LIU ET AL, "Visual pattern recognition using unsupervised spike timing dependent plasticity learning", 2016 INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON NEURAL NETWORKS (IJCNN), IEEE, (20160724), doi:10.1109/IJCNN.2016.7727210, pages 285 - 292, XP032992176 [X] 1-3,14,15 * page 285, right-hand column, lines 17-18 page 287, left-hand column, line 14 to right-hand column, line 40 page 289, right-hand column, lines 6-24;; figures 1,4 * [I] 4-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IJCNN.2016.7727210 | [A] - MATTHIAS OSTER ET AL, "A Spike-Based Saccadic Recognition System", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 2007. ISCAS 2007. IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM O N, IEEE, PI, (2007), ISBN 978-1-4244-0920-4, pages 3083 - 3086, XP031181956 [A] 1-15 * Sections I, II and III * | [A] - YU QIANG ET AL, "Rapid Feedforward Computation by Temporal Encoding and Learning With Spiking Neurons", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS AND LEARNING SYSTEMS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, vol. 24, no. 10, doi:10.1109/TNNLS.2013.2245677, ISSN 2162-237X, (201310), pages 1539 - 1552, (20130927), XP011528216 [A] 1-15 * Sections II-IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNNLS.2013.2245677 |