EP3335994 - AN INFLATABLE EVACUATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/25] | CANOPY SUPPORT | ||
[2020/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 4 Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYNES, Timothy C. 7669 Tumbleweed Rd. Prescott Valley, AZ Arizona 86315 / US | 02 /
BAHENA, Daniel 4731 N. 14th Ave. Phoenix, AZ Arizona 85013 / US | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/04] |
Former [2018/25] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17208504.5 | 19.12.2017 | [2018/25] | Priority number, date | US201615383547 | 19.12.2016 Original published format: US201615383547 | [2018/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3335994 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3335994 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B64D25/14, B63C9/04, B63B27/14 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
B64D25/14 (EP,US);
E04H15/44 (US);
B64D25/18 (US);
B63B2027/145 (EP,US);
B63C2009/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] |
Former [2018/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINE AUFBLASBARE EVAKUIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/29] | English: | AN INFLATABLE EVACUATION DEVICE | [2020/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉVACUATION GONFLABLE | [2020/29] |
Former [2018/25] | DACHSTÜTZE | ||
Former [2018/25] | CANOPY SUPPORT | ||
Former [2018/25] | SUPPORT D'AUVENT | Examination procedure | 20.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 20.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2017 | AL | 27.01.2021 | AT | 27.01.2021 | CY | 27.01.2021 | CZ | 27.01.2021 | DK | 27.01.2021 | EE | 27.01.2021 | ES | 27.01.2021 | FI | 27.01.2021 | HR | 27.01.2021 | IT | 27.01.2021 | LT | 27.01.2021 | LV | 27.01.2021 | MC | 27.01.2021 | MK | 27.01.2021 | NL | 27.01.2021 | PL | 27.01.2021 | RO | 27.01.2021 | RS | 27.01.2021 | SE | 27.01.2021 | SI | 27.01.2021 | SK | 27.01.2021 | SM | 27.01.2021 | TR | 27.01.2021 | BG | 27.04.2021 | NO | 27.04.2021 | GR | 28.04.2021 | IS | 27.05.2021 | PT | 27.05.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.12.2017 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
MK | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 19.12.2017 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 19.12.2017 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2764766 (BOYLE JAMES F, et al) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 29-31,37-40; figures 1-2 * [A] 5-15 [I] 2-4; | [XYI]US2859457 (MANHART CHARLES E) [X] 1 * column 2, line 8 * * column 4, lines 27-29,31-34 * * figures 2-3 * [Y] 5-15 [I] 2-4; | [XAI]GB1167294 (SPORTBOOT GROSSCHOENAU VEB [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, lines 28-32,68-70,105-107 * * figure 2 * [A] 5-15 [I] 2-4; | [Y]US3833088 (CHACKO J, et al) [Y] 5-15* figures 3,8-9 *; | [XAI]DE19610875 (BENKER GERHARD [DE]) [X] 1,8,10 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, lines 32-41 * [A] 5-7,11-15 [I] 2-4,9 |