EP3335673 - SYSTEMS FOR ANCHORING ORTHOPAEDIC IMPLANTS TO BONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyalex Orthopaedics, Inc. 99 Hayden Avenue, Building D, Suite 340 Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2023/25] |
Former [2018/25] | For all designated states Biomimedica, Inc. 290 Utah Avenue, Suite 200 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOURTIS, Lampros c/o Biomimedica, Inc. 290 Utah Avenue Suite 200 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 02 /
JAASMA, Michael, J c/o Biomimedica, Inc. 290 Utah Avenue Suite 200 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 03 /
MYUNG, David c/o Biomimedica, Inc. 290 Utah Avenue Suite 200 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 04 /
HOLLIS, Michael, C c/o Biomimedica, Inc. 290 Utah Avenue Suite 200 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 05 /
HARTDEGEN, Vernon c/o Biomimedica, Inc. 290 Utah Avenue Suite 200 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17208643.1 | 21.11.2012 | [2018/25] | Priority number, date | US201161562187P | 21.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161562187 P | US201161566558P | 02.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161566558 P | US201161566567P | 02.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161566567 P | [2018/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3335673 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/30, A61F2/28, A61F2/46, A61B17/00 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
A61F2/4657 (EP,US);
A61F2/4603 (US);
A61F2/0095 (EP,US);
A61F2/30756 (EP,US);
A61F2/4618 (EP,US);
A61F2/4675 (US);
A61B17/1664 (US);
A61B17/1666 (US);
A61B17/1764 (US);
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61F2/36 (EP,US);
A61F2/38 (EP,US);
A61F2/40 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30014 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30069 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3009 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30594 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30757 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30878 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30971 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3412 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4627 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4628 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4629 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4631 (EP,US);
A61F2002/465 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4685 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4696 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] |
Former [2018/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR VERANKERUNG ORTHOPÄDISCHER IMPLANTATE AN KNOCHEN | [2018/25] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR ANCHORING ORTHOPAEDIC IMPLANTS TO BONE | [2018/25] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'ANCRAGE D'IMPLANTS ORTHOPÉDIQUES AUX OS | [2018/25] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 20.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12851366.0 / EP2782524 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0650707 (HOWMEDICA [IE]) [X] 1,19-21 * column 10, line 2 - column 11, line 28 * * figures 17-20 *; | [X]US6019766 (LING ROBIN S M [GB], et al) [X] 1,7,10,11,19-21 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 34 * * figures 11-16 *; | [X]US2007219640 (STEINBERG AMIRAM [IL]) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,19,21 * paragraph [0047] * * figures 2-5 *; | [X]US2011184423 (RUSHTON NEIL [GB], et al) [X] 1,9,10,21 * abstract * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0048] ** figures 1,2,6 * | by applicant | US20090536233 | US20100973829 | WO2012US20828 |