Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3348178
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.04.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.02.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.01.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.10.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.05.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.02.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.06.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.04.2019 |
Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.02.2019 |
First examination report |
|
18.02.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.01.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.01.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
25.01.2019 |
Change - designated states |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
21.01.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.06.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
03.01.2018 |
Change - representative |
|