EP3503287 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO ANTENNA ARRANGEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC vzw Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITYASHIN, Alexander c/o IMEC VZW, patent department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
STEUDEL, Soeren c/o IMEC VZW, patent department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 03 /
MYNY, Kris c/o IMEC VZW, patent department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 04 /
PAPADOPOULOS, Nikolaos c/o IMEC VZW, patent department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 05 /
MILOSEVSKI, Vlatko c/o IMEC VZW, patent department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 06 /
HEREMANS, Paul c/o IMEC VZW, patent department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 17209346.0 | 21.12.2017 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503287 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/22 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2225 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2283 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (US);
H01Q1/526 (US);
H01Q9/0414 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN ODER IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT ANTENNENANORDNUNGEN | [2019/26] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO ANTENNA ARRANGEMENTS | [2019/26] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS APPORTÉES OU RELATIVES À DES ARRANGEMENTS D'ANTENNES | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 28.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2005088704 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,12,15 * abstract * * page 6, line 23 - page 8, line 29 * [I] 8,11,13,14; | [XI]EP1988575 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,9,10,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] , [0 55] - [0086] * [I] 5; | [X]US2010127084 (PAVATE VIKRAM [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0030] - [0064] * |