EP3345919 - BINDING DOMAINS DIRECTED AGAINST GPCR:G PROTEIN COMPLEXES AND USES DERIVED THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIB VZW Suzanne Tassierstraat 1 9052 Gent / BE | For all designated states Vrije Universiteit Brussel Pleinlaan 2 1050 Brussel / BE | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | For all designated states The Regents of The University of Michigan 1600 Huron Parkway, 2nd Floor Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-2590 / US | [2024/07] |
Former [2021/03] | For all designated states VIB VZW Rijvisschestraat 120 9052 Gent / BE | ||
For all designated states Vrije Universiteit Brussel Pleinlaan 2 1050 Brussel / BE | |||
For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | |||
For all designated states The Regents of The University of Michigan 1600 Huron Parkway, 2nd Floor Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-2590 / US | |||
Former [2019/38] | For all designated states VIB vzw Rijvisschestraat 120 9052 Gent / BE | ||
For all designated states Vrije Universiteit Brussel Pleinlaan 2 1050 Brussel / BE | |||
For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | |||
For all designated states The Regents of The University of Michigan 1600 Huron Parkway, 2nd Floor Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-2590 / US | |||
Former [2018/28] | For all designated states VIB vzw Rijvisschestraat 120 9052 Gent / BE | ||
For all designated states Vrije Universiteit Brussel Pleinlaan 2 1050 Brussel / BE | |||
For all designated states The Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University 3000 El Camino Real Building 5 Suite 300 Palo Alto, California 94306-2100 / US | |||
For all designated states The Regents of The University of Michigan 1600 Huron Parkway, 2nd Floor Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-2590 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEYAERT, Jan Beukenbosstraat 108 1652 Beersel / BE | 02 /
PARDON, Els Hertogstraat 4 3111 Wezemaal / BE | 03 /
LAEREMANS, Toon Krauwenberg 35 1653 Dworp / BE | 04 /
KOBILKA, Brian 840 Chimalus Drive Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 05 /
RASMUSSEN, Søren 330 Curtner Ave 2 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 06 /
GRANIER, Sébastien 140 Chemin des combes 34270 St Mathieu de Treviers / FR | 07 /
SUNAHARA, Roger, K. 13784 Torrey Glenn Rd San Diego CA 92129 / US | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/28] | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 17209368.4 | 21.06.2012 | [2018/28] | Priority number, date | US201161571159P | 21.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161571159 P | EP20110181357 | 15.09.2011 Original published format: EP 11181357 | [2018/28] | Previously filed application, date | WO2012EP62036 | 21.06.2012 | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345919 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/435, C07K16/28 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/70571 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/4722 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/435 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (US);
G01N33/74 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/22 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/569 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2799/026 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BINDUNGSDOMÄNEN GEGEN GPCR: G-PROTEINKOMPLEXE UND DARAUS ABGELEITETE VERWENDUNGEN | [2018/28] | English: | BINDING DOMAINS DIRECTED AGAINST GPCR:G PROTEIN COMPLEXES AND USES DERIVED THEREOF | [2018/28] | French: | DOMAINES DE LIAISON DIRIGÉS CONTRE DES COMPLEXES GPCR: PROTÉINE G ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2018/28] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 10.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12730478.0 / EP2723764 | Divisional application(s) | EP23193788.9 / EP4282882 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   02.08.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004035614 (KAROBIO AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2006086883 (UNIV MONTREAL [CA], et al); | [A]US2007077597 (GILCHRIST ANNETTE [US], et al); | [A]WO2009138519 (ABLYNX NV [BE], et al); |