EP3340175 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RAW SENSOR IMAGE ENHANCEMENT THROUGH GEOREGISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2018/26] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phillips, Daniel T. 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Hylarides, Paul Jacques Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 17209663.8 | 21.12.2017 | [2018/26] | Priority number, date | US201615387486 | 21.12.2016 Original published format: US201615387486 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3340175 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/70, G01C11/02, G01S13/90, G01C21/16 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
G01S13/90 (EP,CN,US);
G06T7/30 (CN,US);
G01C11/00 (CN);
G01C11/02 (EP);
G01C11/06 (CN,US);
G01C21/1652 (EP,CN,US);
G01C21/1656 (EP,CN,US);
G06T7/70 (EP,US);
G06V20/13 (CN);
G06T2207/10032 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10044 (CN,US);
G06T2207/30181 (US);
G06T2207/30244 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/26] | G06T7/70, G01C21/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG VON EINEN UNBEARBEITETEN SENSORBILD DURCH GEOGRAPHISCHE REGISTRIERUNG | [2018/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RAW SENSOR IMAGE ENHANCEMENT THROUGH GEOREGISTRATION | [2018/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AMÉLIORATION D'IMAGES A PARTIR DE CAPTEUR BRUT GRÂCE AU GÉOENREGISTREMENT | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 21.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0101347 (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [X] 1-10,12-15 * page 5, line 13 - page 12, line 16; figure 2 * [I] 11; | [A]EP1677076 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2016073642 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2005220363 |