EP3502945 - A METHOD FOR ACCESSING A DATABASE STORED ON A SERVER USING A RELATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CompuGroup Medical SE & Co. KGaA Maria Trost 21 56070 Koblenz / DE | [2021/33] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states CompuGroup Medical SE Maria Trost 21 56070 Koblenz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHNHARDT, Jan Am Volkspark 32 56070 Koblenz / DE | 02 /
RHO, Tobias Cheruskerstr. 25 53175 Bonn / DE | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB Wilhelmstraße 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 17209778.4 | 21.12.2017 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502945 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3502945 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/62 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
G06F21/6218 (EP,US);
G06F21/6245 (US);
G06F16/22 (US);
G06F16/2379 (US);
G06F16/27 (US);
G06F21/60 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ZUGREIFEN AUF EINE AUF EINEM SERVER GESPEICHERTE DATENBANK UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER RELATION | [2019/26] | English: | A METHOD FOR ACCESSING A DATABASE STORED ON A SERVER USING A RELATION | [2019/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'ACCÉDER À UNE BASE DE DONNÉES STOCKÉE SUR UN SERVEUR À L'AIDE D'UNE RELATION | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 20.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.02.2022 | 10.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | LU | 21.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Yevgeniy Dodis ET AL, "Chosen-Ciphertext Security of Multiple Encryption", Medical image computing and computer-assisted intervention - MICCAI 2015 : 18th international conference, Munich, Germany, October 5-9, 2015; proceedings, Cham, Springer International Publishing, (20050101), vol. 3378, pages 188 - 209, 032548, doi:10.1007/978-3-540-30576-7_11, ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-642-38287-1, XP055481118 [I] 1-20 * page 188 - page 190 * * page 203 - page 205 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-30576-7_11 | [A] - Kolbertbot, "Salt (cryptography)", (20171220), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Salt_(cryptography)&oldid=816286643, (20180608), XP055482370 [A] 5,6 * paragraph [0001] * | [A] - Jcw-Cleanerbot, "Tree (graph theory)", (20171209), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Tree_(graph_theory)&oldid=814472626, (20180611), XP055482786 [A] 12-14 * Chapter: Rooted tree * | by applicant | EP2731044 | EP2731045 | EP2731046 |