EP3503412 - A SECURE SOFTWARE-DEFINED RADIO CHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagravision S.A. 22-24, route de Genève 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONUS, Joël Route d'Echallens 29 1417 Essertines-sur-Yverdon / CH | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 17210095.0 | 22.12.2017 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503412 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/00, H04L29/06, G06F21/76, G06F21/57, H04W12/10 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
H04L63/123 (EP,KR);
H04B1/0003 (EP,KR);
G06F21/72 (US);
G06F21/57 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/76 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/44505 (US);
H04B1/0014 (US);
H04W12/10 (EP,KR);
H04W12/35 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERER SOFTWARE-DEFINIERTER FUNK-CHIP | [2019/26] | English: | A SECURE SOFTWARE-DEFINED RADIO CHIP | [2019/26] | French: | EQUIPEMENT DE RADIO LOGICIELLE SECURISEE | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 24.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0847629 (NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORP [US], et al); | [XI]JP2003304235 (SONY CORP); | [XI]US2003215089 (MIHALJEVIC MIODRAG [JP], et al); | [XI]US2010146274 (NASLUND MATS [SE], et al) |