15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
18.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
03.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
06.03.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
03.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.03.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
18.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.10.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
04.10.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
04.10.2019 |
Change - German title |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
04.10.2019 |
Change - English title |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
04.10.2019 |
Change - French title |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
23.07.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
09.07.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
24.05.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
24.05.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
24.05.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
24.08.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.12.2017 |
Change - representative |
|