EP3503599 - EMERGENCY NETWORK SLICE AND METHOD AND ACCESS NETWORK ENTITY FOR PROCESSING AN EMERGENCY COMMUNICATION IN A PACKET SWITCHED COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/26] | EMERGENCY NETWORK SLICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING AN EMERGENCY COMMUNICATION IN A PACKET SWITCHED COMMUNICATION NETWORK | ||
[2019/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lauster, Reinhard Südtirolerstraße 30 3100 St. Pölten / AT | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/26] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17210112.3 | 22.12.2017 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503599 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3503599 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/90, H04W76/50, H04W48/18, H04L29/08, H04L29/06, H04L12/755, // H04L12/46, H04L12/701, H04M1/725, H04M3/51, H04M11/04, H04W36/00, H04W84/04, H04W88/02 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
H04L12/4641 (EP);
H04L45/021 (EP);
H04L65/1016 (EP);
H04L65/1069 (EP);
H04W36/0066 (EP,US);
H04W36/13 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W40/02 (US);
H04W76/50 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP);
H04M1/72418 (EP);
H04M11/04 (EP);
H04M2242/04 (EP);
H04M3/5116 (EP);
H04Q2213/1337 (EP);
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W84/042 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | H04W4/90, H04W76/50, H04W48/18, H04L29/08, H04L29/06, // H04L12/46, H04L12/701, H04M1/725, H04M3/51, H04M11/04, H04W36/00, H04W84/04, H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | NOTFALLNETZWERKSEGMENT UND VERFAHREN UND ZUGANGSNETZWERKSEINHEIT ZUM VERARBEITEN EINER NOTFALLKOMMUNIKATION IN EINEM PAKETVERMITTELTEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2019/45] | English: | EMERGENCY NETWORK SLICE AND METHOD AND ACCESS NETWORK ENTITY FOR PROCESSING AN EMERGENCY COMMUNICATION IN A PACKET SWITCHED COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2019/45] | French: | TRANCHE DU RÉSEAU D'URGENCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE COMMUNICATION D'URGENCE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION À COMMUTATION PAR PAQUETS, ET ENTITÉ DU RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS CORRESPONDANTE | [2019/45] |
Former [2019/26] | NOTFALLNETZWERKSEGMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERARBEITEN EINER NOTFALLKOMMUNIKATION IN EINEM PAKETVERMITTELTEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | ||
Former [2019/26] | EMERGENCY NETWORK SLICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING AN EMERGENCY COMMUNICATION IN A PACKET SWITCHED COMMUNICATION NETWORK | ||
Former [2019/26] | TRANCHE DU RÉSEAU D'URGENCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE COMMUNICATION D'URGENCE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION À COMMUTATION PAR PAQUETS | Examination procedure | 16.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 16.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | IE | 22.12.2020 | LU | 22.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 22.12.2020 | ||
LU | 22.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009316683 (GASS RAYMOND [FR], et al); | [A]US2009323672 (GUPTA VIVEK [US], et al); |