EP3340645 - EAR UNIT FOR A PORTABLE SOUND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/26] | EAR UNIT AND PORTABLE SOUND DEVICE | ||
[2019/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul, 07336 / KR | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NA, Yonghyuk IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 02 /
KANG, Jungyoun IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 03 /
LEE, Jaeyoung IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 04 /
YOU, Teahoon IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | 05 /
HAN, Shin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 Seoul / KR | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 17210265.9 | 22.12.2017 | [2018/26] | Priority number, date | KR20160179178 | 26.12.2016 Original published format: KR 20160179178 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3340645 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3340645 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3340645 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/12, H04R1/28, H04R1/10, // H04R5/033 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
H04R5/0335 (EP,US);
H04R1/2826 (KR);
H04R1/1008 (US);
H04R1/1016 (EP,US);
H04R1/1033 (KR);
H04R1/1066 (KR);
H04R1/1075 (KR);
H04R1/1083 (US);
H04R1/2803 (EP,US);
H04R2420/07 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] |
Former [2018/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OHREINHEIT FÜR EINE TRAGBARE SCHALLVORRICHTUNG | [2019/26] | English: | EAR UNIT FOR A PORTABLE SOUND DEVICE | [2019/26] | French: | UNITÉ D'OREILLE POUR UN DISPOSITIF ACOUSTIQUE PORTABLE | [2019/26] |
Former [2018/26] | OHREINHEIT UND TRAGBARE SCHALLVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2018/26] | EAR UNIT AND PORTABLE SOUND DEVICE | ||
Former [2018/26] | UNITÉ D'OREILLE ET DISPOSITIF ACOUSTIQUE PORTABLE | Examination procedure | 21.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 21.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2017 | AL | 06.11.2019 | AT | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | ES | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | IT | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | NL | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | RS | 06.11.2019 | SE | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | IE | 22.12.2019 | LU | 22.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | BG | 06.02.2020 | NO | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.12.2017 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.12.2017 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 22.12.2017 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 22.12.2019 | ||
LU | 22.12.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 06.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009104833 (CRESYN CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0040]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2011031060 (EPPING HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0056]; figures 11-14 *; | [XI]EP2822293 (JETVOX ACOUSTIC CORP [TW], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 9] - [0011]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0 16] , [0 17] , [0 19]; figures 2-4 * * paragraph [0015]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0018]; figures 9, 10 * [I] 2,5,7-10; | [I]KR101673414B (BLUECOM CO LTD [KR]) [I] 11-15* paragraphs [0027] , [0 29]; figures 1, 2, 7, 8 *; | [A]CN106165442 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | KR20160179178 |