EP3501523 - TWO-COMPONENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ACETYL SALICYLIC ACID AND A CARBONATE SALT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asamedic AS P.O. Box 6621 Etterstad 0607 Oslo / NO | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREDRIKSON, John, Bjørn Solbærvegen 5 N-2409 ELVERUM / NO | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 17210437.4 | 22.12.2017 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3501523 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/616, A61K47/02, A61K9/08, A61P9/10 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
A61K31/616 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP);
A61K9/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWEIKOMPONENTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND ACETYLSALICYLSÄURE UND EIN CARBONATSALZ | [2019/26] | English: | TWO-COMPONENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ACETYL SALICYLIC ACID AND A CARBONATE SALT | [2019/26] | French: | COMPOSITIONS À DEUX COMPOSANTS CONTENANT DE L'ACIDE ACÉTYLSALICYLIQUE ET D'UN SEL CARBONATE | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 29.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US2012316140 (PHYKITT HOWARD [US]) [XD] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0063] * * examples 1-2 * * page 1-; claims 1-24 *; | [XD]WO2017001468 (ASAMEDIC AS [NO]) [XD] 1-6 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 7 * * page 3, line 14 - page 6, line 6 * * examples 1-7 * * claims 1-17 *; | [E]WO2018002124 (ASAMEDIC AS [NO]) [E] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 14 * * page 3, line 30 - page 7, line 16 * * page 10, line 4 - line 29 * * examples 1-2 ** claims 1-30 * | by applicant | US5776431 | WO9838104 | EP1428525 | US2005008690 | US2012316140 | EP2777802 | WO2015061521 | WO2017001468 | - "Chemical stability of Pharmaceuticals", CONNORS et al., A Handbook for Pharmacists, pages 151 - 160 | - ELWOOD et al., The Pharmaceutical Journal, (20010000), vol. 266, page 315 |