EP3346698 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR EPISODE TRACKING IN AN INTERACTIVE MEDIA ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adeia Guides Inc. 3025 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2024/36] |
Former [2018/28] | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2160 Gold Street San Jose, CA 95002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Condray, Charles 200 Mercer Street, Apt. 2B New York, New York 10012 / US | 02 /
Walker, Todd A. 77 Highpoint Drive Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US | 03 /
Armaly, Samir B. 4400 Belair Drive La Canada, California 91011 / US | [2023/36] |
Former [2018/28] | 01 /
Condray, Charles 200 Mercer Street Apt. 2B New York, New York 10012 / US | ||
02 /
Walker, Todd A. 77 Highpoint Drive Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US | |||
03 /
Armaly, Samir B. 4400 Belair Drive La Canada, California 91011 / US | Representative(s) | Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [2023/36] |
Former [2018/28] | Pisani, Diana Jean, et al Haley Guiliano International LLP Central Court 25 Southampton Buildings London WC2A 1AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17210592.6 | 08.12.2006 | [2018/28] | Priority number, date | US20050324156 | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 324156 | US20050323464 | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 323464 | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3346698 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3346698 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N21/482 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
H04N7/16 (EP);
H04N21/252 (EP);
H04N21/42206 (EP);
H04N21/458 (EP);
H04N21/466 (EP);
H04N21/4667 (EP);
H04N21/4751 (EP);
H04N21/4826 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR EPISODENVERFOLGUNG IN EINER INTERAKTIVEN MEDIENUMGEBUNG | [2018/28] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR EPISODE TRACKING IN AN INTERACTIVE MEDIA ENVIRONMENT | [2018/28] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉ DE SUIVI D'ÉPISODE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT INTERACTIF MULTIMÉDIA | [2018/28] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 10.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06839252.1 / EP1969844 | EP09013672.2 / EP2169952 | EP14177889.4 / EP2802142 | EP16186673.6 / EP3169061 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.2024
27.05.2024
ADMISSIBLE RTL Interactive GmbH Picassoplatz 1 50679 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Kiani, Nassim Kiani & Springorum Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Taubenstrasse 4 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/27] | 20.06.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | LU | 08.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/12] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0184340 (ON24 INC [US]); | [I]WO0207433 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [A]US2003061610 (ERRICO JAMES H [US]); | [I]US2003190150 (KAWASAKI MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2003208763 (MCELHATTEN DAVID [US], et al); | [I]US2004111756 (STUCKMAN BRUCE E [US], et al); | [I]JP2004343520 (SHARP KK); | [I]US2005055715 (MINNICK DAN [US], et al); | [A]EP1534014 (ENSEQUENCE INC [US]); | [A]US2005235316 (AHMAD-TAYLOR TY O [US]); | [I]JP2005348153 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | US2001047298 | US2003149988 | US2005229213 |