EP3343740 - POWER GENERATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wuhan Linptech Co., Ltd Room 305 No. 8 Fortune Second Road Donger Industrial Park Donghugaoxin District Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | [2023/30] |
Former [2018/27] | For all designated states Wuhan Linptech Co., Ltd Building 4, North Part, A5, 1 Term Qibu Part, Future Science Block No.999, Gaoxin Avenue Donghu New-Tech Development Zone 430000 Wuhan Hubei / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zou, Xiao hua Building 4, North Part, A5, 1 Term, Qibu Part Future Science Block, No.999 Gaoxin Avenue, Donghu New-tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | 02 /
Cheng, Xiao ke Building 4, North Part, A5, 1 Term, Qibu Part Future Science Block, No.999 Gaoxin Avenue, Donghu New-tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Chung, Hoi Kan Mandarin IP Limited 7 Cherry Trees Great Shelford Cambridge CB22 5XA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/44] | Chung, Hoi Kan Mandarin IP Limited 7 Cherry Trees Great Shelford Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB22 5XA / GB | ||
Former [2018/27] | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 17211089.2 | 29.12.2017 | [2018/27] | Priority number, date | CN201611267608 | 31.12.2016 Original published format: CN201611267608 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3343740 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3343740 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02K35/02, H02K7/18 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
H02K35/02 (EP,CN,US);
H01F41/0233 (US);
H02K1/14 (US);
H02K7/1853 (US);
H02K7/1892 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STROMERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/27] | English: | POWER GENERATION DEVICE | [2018/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ | [2018/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 04.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.08.2024
02.08.2024
ADMISSIBLE Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way Croydon, London CR0 0XZ / GB Opponent's representative Fry, David John Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way Croydon, Greater London CR0 0XZ / GB | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.08.2024
Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way Croydon, London CR0 0XZ / GB Opponent's representative Fry, David John Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way Croydon, Greater London CR0 0XZ / GB | 16.08.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | MC | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RO | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RO | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SK | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RO | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]ES2310477 (SERRACANTA MARCET MARIA DEL MAR [ES]) [X] 1,14 * MACHINE TRANSLATION FROM SPANISH TO ENGLISH;; figures 1,2,9,11 *; | [A]CN102938600 (WUHAN LINPTECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2015340938 (RUFF EDUARD [DE]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XI]CN205693542U (LIAO SHUHUI) [X] 1,14 * MACHINE TRANSLATION FROM CHINESE TO ENGLISH;; figures 3,5A,5B,12-16 * [I] 2-13,15 | Examination | CN105874689 |