EP3343215 - ION MIGRATION TUBE FOR AN ION MOBILITY SPECTROMETER AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A TongFang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | For all designated states Tsinghua University No. 1 Tsinghua Yuan Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Qingjun 2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building Shuangqinglu, Haidian District Beijing, 100084 / CN | 02 /
LI, Yuanjing 2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building Shuangqinglu, Haidian District Beijing, 100084 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Ziran 2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing, 100084 / CN | 04 /
ZHU, Weiping 2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing, 100084 / CN | 05 /
HE, Huishao 2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing, 100084 / CN | 06 /
LI, Xianghua 2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing, 100084 / CN | 07 /
MA, Qiufeng 2nd Floor, Block A, TongFang Building Shuangqinglu, Haidian District Beijing, 100084 / CN | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17211140.3 | 29.12.2017 | [2018/27] | Priority number, date | CN201611270479 | 29.12.2016 Original published format: CN201611270479 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3343215 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3343215 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/622 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G01N27/622 (EP,CN,US);
H01J49/063 (CN,US);
H01J49/42 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/27] | G01N27/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Title | German: | IONENMIGRATIONSROHR FÜR EIN IONMOBILITÄTSSPEKTROMETER UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON | [2023/26] | English: | ION MIGRATION TUBE FOR AN ION MOBILITY SPECTROMETER AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME | [2018/27] | French: | TUBE DE MIGRATION IONIQUE POUR UN SPECTROMÈTRE DE MOBILITÉ IONIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2023/26] |
Former [2018/27] | IONENMIGRATIONSROHR UND IONMOBILITÄTSSPEKTROMETER UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON | ||
Former [2018/27] | TUBE DE MIGRATION IONIQUE SPECTROMÈTRE DE MOBILITÉ IONIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | Examination procedure | 29.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 29.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008179515 (SPERLINE ROGER P [US]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * figures 6a-c * * [0050-0060] * [I] 5,6,10,11; | [A]CN102313774B (UNIV TSINGHUA, et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]CN102903598B (THIRD RES INST MINI PUBL SECU) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015188295 (ZHANG QINGJUN [CN], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | Examination | US2015221489 |