EP3382575 - ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT FILE ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKIM IT LTD 182 Worcester Road Bromsgrove, Worcestershire B61 7AZ / GB | [2018/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARLTON, Christopher SKIM IT LTD 182 Worcester Road Bromsgrove, Worcestershire B61 7AZ / GB | 02 /
LEHL, Maria SKIM IT LTD 182 Worcester Road Bromsgrove, Worcestershire B61 7AZ / GB | 03 /
OLIVEIRA, Marcia SKIM IT LTD 182 Worcester Road Bromsgrove, Worcestershire B61 7AZ / GB | 04 /
BATCHKAROV, Miroslav SKIM IT LTD 182 Worcester Road Bromsgrove, Worcestershire B61 7AZ / GB | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | EIP EIP Europe LLP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17275041.6 | 27.03.2017 | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3382575 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
G06F16/958 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] |
Former [2018/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE DOKUMENTDATEIANALYSE | [2018/40] | English: | ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT FILE ANALYSIS | [2018/40] | French: | ANALYSE DE FICHIERS DE DOCUMENTS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2018/40] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 03.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/21] | 28.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.12.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]US2003229854 (LEMAY MLCHEL [CA]) [ID] 1-15 * abstract *; | [ID]US2015095770 (MANI INDERJEET [TH], et al) [ID] 1-15 * abstract * | [ID] - M. E. PETERS; D. LECOCQ, "Content Extraction Using a Diverse Feature Set", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 22ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WORLD WIDE WEB, (20130513), pages 89 - 90, XP058019553 [ID] 1-15 * section 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2487788.2487828 | by applicant | US2003229854 | US2015095770 | US2015339288 | - M. E. PETERS; D. LECOCQ, "Content Extraction Using a Diverse Feature Set", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 22ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WORLD WIDE WEB, (20130513), pages 89 - 90, XP002773276 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2487788.2487828 | - Q. MEI; J. GUO; D. RADEV, "Divrank: the Interplay of Prestige and Diversity in Information Networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 16TH ACM SIGKDD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY AND DATA MINING, (201007), pages 1009 - 1018 |