EP3369902 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING THE VALIDITY OF A MEASURED CONCENTRATION OF UREA IN A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEAS France 4, rue Gaye-Marie 31027 Toulouse Cedex 3 / FR | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOULON-MEEKHUN, Dariga 27 rue des Pinson 31520 Ramonville / FR | 02 /
FOUGERE, Tom Appt B425 18 rue de Cugnaux 31300 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
MILPIED, Jean 84 boulevard Jean Brunhes 31300 Toulouse / FR | 04 /
GAUNARD, Florent Appt. 301 16 rue Félex Lavit 31400 Toulouse / FR | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/36] | Application number, filing date | 17305232.5 | 03.03.2017 | [2018/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3369902 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3369902 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F01N11/00 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP);
F01N11/00 (EP);
F01N2550/05 (EP);
F01N2610/02 (EP);
F01N2900/1811 (EP);
F01N2900/1818 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] |
Former [2018/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER GÜLTIGKEIT EINER GEMESSENEN KONZENTRATION VON HARNSTOFF IN EINEM FLUID | [2018/36] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING THE VALIDITY OF A MEASURED CONCENTRATION OF UREA IN A FLUID | [2018/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER LA VALIDITÉ D'UNE CONCENTRATION D'URÉE MESURÉE DANS UN FLUIDE | [2018/36] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 31.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2017 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | IT | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 03.03.2017 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1752762 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] *; | [A]WO2007104779 (INERGY AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS RES [BE], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 6; figures 1,3 *; | [A]JP2008248710 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]WO2009008408 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [X]US2011107812 (KASAHARA HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] - [0080]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]FR2972489 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1-19 * figures 1,2; claims 1-5 * |