EP3388092 - CONNECTIVE TISSUES, SUCH AS BONE, DENTIN OR PULP, REGENERATIVE MATERIAL COMPRISING CALCIUM SILICATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Septodont ou Septodont SAS ou Specialites Septodont 58 Rue du Pont de Créteil 94100 Saint Maur des Fossés / FR | For all designated states Université Paris Descartes - Paris V 12, rue de l'Ecole de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101 rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | For all designated states UNIVERSITÈ PIERRE ET MARIE CURIE - PARIS 6 (UPMC) 4 place Jussieu 75005 Paris / FR | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERES, Fleur 24 rue Palouzie 93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | 02 /
RICHARD, Gilles 32 rue Edouard Branly 91560 Crosne / FR | 03 /
DESSOMBZ, Arnaud 40 rue Curial 75019 Paris / FR | 04 /
SIMON, Stéphane 280 Sente des Forrières 76230 Bois Guillaume / FR | 05 /
ISAAC, Juliane 21 rue de l'Evangile 75018 Paris / FR | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 17305444.6 | 13.04.2017 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3388092 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/44 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
A61L27/446 (EP);
A61L2430/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BINDEGEWEBE, WIE KNOCHEN, DENTIN ODER ZELLSTOFF, REGENERATIVES MATERIAL MIT KALZIUMSILIKAT | [2018/42] | English: | CONNECTIVE TISSUES, SUCH AS BONE, DENTIN OR PULP, REGENERATIVE MATERIAL COMPRISING CALCIUM SILICATE | [2018/42] | French: | TISSUS CONJONCTIFS, TEL QUE L'OS, LA DENTINE OU LA PULPE, MATÉRIAU RÉGÉNÉRATIF COMPRENANT DU SILICATE DE CALCIUM | [2018/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/42] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017031906 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH [CN]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [I] - A.L. OLIVEIRA ET AL, "Biomimetic Coating of Starch Based Polymeric Foams Produced by a Calcium Silicate Based Methodology", KEY ENGINEERING MATERIALS, (20030101), vol. 240-242, doi:10.4028/www.scientific.net/KEM.240-242.101, pages 101 - 104, XP055411096 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * Materials & Methods; page 102 * * Conclusions; page 104 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4028/www.scientific.net/KEM.240-242.101 | by applicant | EP0555807 | US6214048 | WO0045871 | WO2008076671 |